NICKNAM et al v. POMPEO et al
Plaintiff: AHMAD NICKNAM and AFSOON NICKNAM
Defendant: MIKE POMPEO, PHILIP FRAYNE, CARL RISCH, KEVIN MCALEENAN, JOHN DOES #1-#10 and MICHAEL RICHARD POMPEO
Case Number: 1:2019cv02771
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KEVIN MCALEENAN served on 11/12/2019 (Nimer, Jennifer)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. PHILIP FRAYNE served on 11/12/2019; MICHAEL RICHARD POMPEO served on 11/12/2019; CARL RISCH served on 11/12/2019 (Nimer, Jennifer)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/26/2019. (Nimer, Jennifer)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/19/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/18/2019. (Nimer, Jennifer)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to PHILIP FRAYNE, KEVIN MCALEENAN, MIKE POMPEO, CARL RISCH, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
September 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zeg)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS AND COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6380506) filed by AFSOON NICKNAM, AHMAD NICKNAM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I-130 Notice, #2 Exhibit DS-260, #3 Exhibit 221(g), #4 Exhibit Embassy Response, #5 Exhibit Inquiry, #6 Exhibit Inquiry, #7 Exhibit Congressional Inquiry, #8 Exhibit Embassy Website Case Status, #9 Exhibit CEAC, #10 Exhibit Physician Letter, #11 Exhibit SAO Email, #12 Exhibit Op Q and A, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Summons USAO, #15 Summons USAG, #16 Summons Sec of State, #17 Summons Acting Sec of DHS, #18 Summons Assistant Sec of Consular Affairs, #19 Summons CG Abu Dhabi Embassy)(Nimer, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NICKNAM et al v. POMPEO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHMAD NICKNAM
Represented By: Jennifer E. Nimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AFSOON NICKNAM
Represented By: Jennifer E. Nimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE POMPEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIP FRAYNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARL RISCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN MCALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES #1-#10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL RICHARD POMPEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?