FOOD & WATER WATCH, INC. et al v. TYSON FOODS, INC.
Plaintiff: ORGANIC CONSUMERS ASSOCIATION and FOOD & WATER WATCH, INC.
Defendant: TYSON FOODS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02811
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Sipos on behalf of TYSON FOODS, INC. (Sipos, Charles)
October 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Watts Staniar on behalf of TYSON FOODS, INC. (Staniar, Lauren)
October 25, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Opposition due by 11/18/2019. Reply due by 12/6/2019. (zjd)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Motion for Briefing Schedule. Defendant shall file its Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand on or before November 18, 2019; and Plaintiffs shall file their Reply on or before December 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/25/2019. (lcapm2)
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by TYSON FOODS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tobin, Thomas)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Charles Christian Sipos is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Defendant. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/23/2019. (lcapm2)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Lauren Watts Staniar is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Defendant. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/23/2019. (lcapm2)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Charles Christian Sipos, :Firm- Perkins Coie LLP, :Address- 1201 Third Avenue, Seattle, WA 98101. Phone No. - 206-359-8000. Fax No. - 206-359-9000 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6474461. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by TYSON FOODS, INC. (Tobin, Thomas)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lauren Watts Staniar, :Firm- Perkins Coie LLP, :Address- 1201 third Avenue, Seattle, WA 98101. Phone No. - 206-359-8000. Fax No. - 206-359-9000 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number CDCDC-6474414. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by TYSON FOODS, INC. (Tobin, Thomas)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by FOOD & WATER WATCH, INC., ORGANIC CONSUMERS ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND, AND FOR FEES AND COSTS, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Richman, Kim). Added MOTION for Attorney Fees on 10/22/2019 (znmw).
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint within thirty days after the court rules on Plaintiffs' forthcoming motion to remand. If Plaintiffs do not file a motion to remand on or before October 18, 2019, Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before November 18, 2019. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/25/2019. (lcapm2)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by TYSON FOODS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tobin, Thomas)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Complaint, (zeg)
September 20, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zeg)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FOOD & WATER WATCH, INC., ORGANIC CONSUMERS ASSOCIATION. (Tobin, Thomas) Modified event on 9/20/2019 (zeg).
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Tobin on behalf of TYSON FOODS, INC. (Tobin, Thomas)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FOOD & WATER WATCH, INC., ORGANIC CONSUMERS ASSOCIATION with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6385355) filed by TYSON FOODS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Superior Court Documents A-1-A-4 to Removal, #3 Declaration of Christopher Miles)(Tobin, Thomas) Modified docket event on 9/20/2019 (zeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FOOD & WATER WATCH, INC. et al v. TYSON FOODS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ORGANIC CONSUMERS ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FOOD & WATER WATCH, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TYSON FOODS, INC.
Represented By: Thomas J. Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?