SAI CORNERSTONE INC. et al v. BARAN et al
Plaintiff: Malika Gaonkar, Sai Cornerstone, SAI CORNERSTONE INC. and MALIKA KISANRAI GAONKAR
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, DHS, KATHY A. BARAN, USCIS, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES and KEVIN MCALEENAN
Case Number: 1:2019cv02816
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: John D Bates
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #3 plaintiffs' motion for leave for Dobrina Ustun to appear pro hac vice, and pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter the appearance of Dobrina Ustun on behalf of plaintiffs. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 09/24/2019. (lcjdb2)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to KEVIN MCALEENAN. (ztd)
September 22, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST to issue (Summons for Def Kevin McAleenan) by MALIKA KISANRAI GAONKAR, SAI CORNERSTONE INC. #1 Complaint filed by SAI CORNERSTONE INC., MALIKA KISANRAI GAONKAR. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Ahmad, Hassan) Modified on 9/23/2019 (ztd).
September 20, 2019 SUMMONS Not Issued as to KEVIN MCALEENAN (zeg)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to KATHY A. BARAN, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
September 20, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zeg)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Dobrina Ustun, :Firm- Ustun Law Group, :Address- 12700 Hillcrest Rd, Suite 125 Dallas TX 75230. Phone No. - 469.994.9407. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6388307. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Malika Gaonkar, Sai Cornerstone (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Cert of good standing)(Ahmad, Hassan)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 ERRATA Proposed Summonses for All Defendants, USAG, USADC by Malika Gaonkar, Sai Cornerstone #1 Complaint filed by Malika Gaonkar, Sai Cornerstone. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Ahmad, Hassan)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6387797) filed by Sai Cornerstone, Malika Gaonkar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ahmad, Hassan) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/20/2019) (zeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAI CORNERSTONE INC. et al v. BARAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHY A. BARAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN MCALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malika Gaonkar
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sai Cornerstone
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAI CORNERSTONE INC.
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Dobrina Ustun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALIKA KISANRAI GAONKAR
Represented By: Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
Represented By: Dobrina Ustun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?