O.B. SWEET, LLC v. BUCHER et al
Plaintiff: O.B. SWEET, LLC, ALLISON SYDNOR, ERIN BLAKELY and CATHERINE CULLINAN
Defendant: MARK BUCHER and MEDIUM RARE CLEVELAND PARK, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02830
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Richard J Leon
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ERIN BLAKELY, CATHERINE CULLINAN, O.B. SWEET, LLC, ALLISON SYDNOR Proof of Service Medium Rare. (Iwashko, Lev)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ERIN BLAKELY, CATHERINE CULLINAN, O.B. SWEET, LLC, ALLISON SYDNOR Proof Of Service to Bucher. (Iwashko, Lev)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/11/2019. (lcrjl1)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to MARK BUCHER, MEDIUM RARE CLEVELAND PARK, LLC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
September 30, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (zsb)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by O.B. SWEET, LLC.(Iwashko, Lev)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 ERRATA Corrected Complaint by O.B. SWEET, LLC. (Iwashko, Lev)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MARK BUCHER ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616100781) with Jury Demand filed by O.B. SWEET, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O.B. SWEET, LLC v. BUCHER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK BUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDIUM RARE CLEVELAND PARK, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O.B. SWEET, LLC
Represented By: Lev Ivan Gabriel Iwashko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLISON SYDNOR
Represented By: Lev Ivan Gabriel Iwashko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIN BLAKELY
Represented By: Lev Ivan Gabriel Iwashko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHERINE CULLINAN
Represented By: Lev Ivan Gabriel Iwashko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?