ROSE, JR. et al v. AZAR, II et al
Plaintiff: Mary Holbrock, Rhonda Cree, Monte A. Rose Jr., Erin Nicole Tomlinson and MONTE A. ROSE, JR.
Defendant: Alex Azar, Demetrios Kouzoukas, Seema Verma, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, United States Department of Health and Human Services, ALEX M. AZAR, II and DEMETRIOS L. KOUZOUKAS
Intervenor Defendant: INDIANA FAMILY AND SOCIAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv02848
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: As discussed at today's hearing, the Court ORDERS that: 1) Plaintiffs' #16 Motion for Briefing Schedule is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; 2) Federal Defendants' #18 Motion to Stay is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; 3) Defendants shall produce the administrative record by December 5, 2019; 4) By December 9, 2019, Federal Defendants shall file a Notice setting forth whether they believe that: a) the approval of Indiana's work requirements is materially different from that of Kentucky's or Arkansas's or b) a D.C. Circuit merits affirmance in the Kentucky and Arkansas cases would also bar the work requirements here; 5) Federal Defendants and Intervenor Defendant shall file any brief by January 6, 2020, explaining why a) the approval of Indiana's work requirements is materially different and/or b) why even if it is not, other challenged components of HIP should not be struck down in the event the D.C. Circuit affirms this Court's rulings on the Kentucky and Arkansas approvals; 6) Plaintiffs shall file any response by January 27, 2020, and Defendants shall file any reply by February 10, 2020; and 7) Defendants reserve the right to take different positions in the event the D.C. Circuit decision is not a straight affirmance on the grounds set forth by this Court. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/21/2019. (lcjeb2)
November 21, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Motion Hearing held on 11/21/2019 re #16 MOTION for Briefing Schedule and #18 Joint MOTION to Stay. Further Order to be issued by the Court. Court Reporter: Lisa Griffith. (zcal)
November 19, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2019 at 11:45 AM in Courtroom 25A before Judge James E. Boasberg. (znbn)
November 19, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Natacha Y. Lam on behalf of RHONDA CREE, MARY HOLBROCK, MONTE A. ROSE, JR, ERIN NICOLE TOMLINSON (Lam, Natacha)
November 19, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Devi M. Rao on behalf of RHONDA CREE, MARY HOLBROCK, MONTE A. ROSE, JR, ERIN NICOLE TOMLINSON (Rao, Devi)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall appear for a hearing on the pending #18 Motion to Stay on November 21, 2019, at 11:45 a.m. in Courtroom 25. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/19/2019. (lcjeb2)
November 19, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Vinita B. Andrapalliyal on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, DEMETRIOS L. KOUZOUKAS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, SEEMA VERMA (Andrapalliyal, Vinita)
November 11, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to opposition to motion re #18 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by ALEX M. AZAR, II, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, DEMETRIOS L. KOUZOUKAS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, SEEMA VERMA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Gateway to Work FAQ)(Skurnik, Matthew)
November 8, 2019 NOTICE OF ERROR re #20 Response to motion; emailed to perkins@healthlaw.org, cc'd 10 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. In future, attorney signature on the pleading and PACER login must match. (ztth, )
November 5, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to opposition to motion re #16 MOTION for Briefing Schedule filed by RHONDA CREE, MARY HOLBROCK, MONTE A. ROSE, JR, ERIN NICOLE TOMLINSON. (See Docket entry #20 to view document) (ztth)
November 5, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE re #18 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings, #16 MOTION for Briefing Schedule filed by RHONDA CREE, MARY HOLBROCK, MONTE A. ROSE, JR, ERIN NICOLE TOMLINSON. (Perkins, Jane)
October 31, 2019 Filing 19 Memorandum in opposition to re #16 MOTION for Briefing Schedule filed by ALEX M. AZAR, II, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, DEMETRIOS L. KOUZOUKAS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, SEEMA VERMA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FSSA News Release, #2 Exhibit Monitoring Report, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Skurnik, Matthew)
October 31, 2019 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by ALEX M. AZAR, II, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, DEMETRIOS L. KOUZOUKAS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, SEEMA VERMA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit FSSA News Release, #3 Exhibit Monitoring Report, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Skurnik, Matthew)
October 31, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Charles Skurnik on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, DEMETRIOS L. KOUZOUKAS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, SEEMA VERMA (Skurnik, Matthew)
October 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Opposition due by 10/31/2019. (nbn)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that if Defendants oppose Plaintiffs' #16 Motion for Briefing Schedule, they shall file such opposition by October 31, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/28/2019. (lcjeb2)
October 23, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Briefing Schedule by RHONDA CREE, MARY HOLBROCK, MONTE A. ROSE, JR, ERIN NICOLE TOMLINSON (McKee, Catherine)
October 17, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A. McKee on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McKee, Catherine)
October 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip J. Peisch on behalf of INDIANA FAMILY AND SOCIAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (Peisch, Philip)
October 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline Montrose Brown on behalf of INDIANA FAMILY AND SOCIAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (Brown, Caroline)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Indiana Family and Social Services Administration's #12 Motion to Intervene as Defendant. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/15/2019. (lcjeb2)
October 11, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene As Defendant by Indiana Family and Social Services Administration (Fisher, Thomas)
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Molnar Fisher on behalf of Indiana Family and Social Services Administration (Fisher, Thomas)
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/27/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/26/2019. (Perkins, Jane)
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/27/2019. (Perkins, Jane)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES served on 9/27/2019 (Perkins, Jane)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 9/27/2019 (Perkins, Jane)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEMETRIOS L. KOUZOUKAS served on 9/27/2019 (Perkins, Jane)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SEEMA VERMA served on 9/27/2019 (Perkins, Jane)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 9/27/2019 (Perkins, Jane)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, DEMETRIOS L. KOUZOUKAS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, SEEMA VERMA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
September 25, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zeg)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 1:18-cv-00152; 1:18-cv-01900; 1:19-cv-773. (Perkins, Jane)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6393374) filed by Mary Holbrock, Rhonda Cree, Monte A. Rose Jr., Erin Nicole Tomlinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons)(Perkins, Jane) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/26/2019) (znmw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROSE, JR. et al v. AZAR, II et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demetrios Kouzoukas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seema Verma
Represented By: Matthew Charles Skurnik
Represented By: Vinita B. Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES
Represented By: Matthew Charles Skurnik
Represented By: Vinita B. Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Matthew Charles Skurnik
Represented By: Vinita B. Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Matthew Charles Skurnik
Represented By: Vinita B. Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEMETRIOS L. KOUZOUKAS
Represented By: Matthew Charles Skurnik
Represented By: Vinita B. Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Holbrock
Represented By: Jane Perkins
Represented By: Devi M. Rao
Represented By: Natacha Y. Lam
Represented By: Catherine A. McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Cree
Represented By: Jane Perkins
Represented By: Devi M. Rao
Represented By: Natacha Y. Lam
Represented By: Catherine A. McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monte A. Rose Jr.
Represented By: Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Nicole Tomlinson
Represented By: Jane Perkins
Represented By: Devi M. Rao
Represented By: Natacha Y. Lam
Represented By: Catherine A. McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONTE A. ROSE, JR.
Represented By: Jane Perkins
Represented By: Devi M. Rao
Represented By: Natacha Y. Lam
Represented By: Catherine A. McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: INDIANA FAMILY AND SOCIAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Caroline Montrose Brown
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Represented By: Philip J. Peisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?