SLAUGHTER v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Plaintiff: ALYSON SLAUGHTER
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) and NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv02920
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12188
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and, MOTION to Dismiss by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Sunil Tewari, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Alison)
November 1, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responsive Pleading due by 11/18/2019. (zjd)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file its Response on or before November 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/01/2019. (lcapm2)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Alison)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION served on 10/14/2019, answer due 11/4/2019 (Kaliel, Jeffrey)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
October 3, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zeg)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 ERRATA by ALYSON SLAUGHTER #1 Complaint, filed by ALYSON SLAUGHTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kaliel, Jeffrey) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/3/2019) (zeg).
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6404518) filed by ALYSON SLAUGHTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kaliel, Jeffrey) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/3/2019) (zeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SLAUGHTER v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALYSON SLAUGHTER
Represented By: Jeffrey Kaliel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Represented By: Alison N. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?