AGBARA v. AT&T MOBILITY LLC et al
Plaintiff: EMMANUEL AGBARA
Defendant: KINSLEY KELECHI OGIDEH, LIVINITY OKPARAEKE, AT&T MOBILITY LLC, CHARLES EDEH, NIGERIAN CATHOLIC COMMUNITY AT ST. JEROME CATHOLIC CHURCH and EVELYN ONYENYI OKOJI
Case Number: 1:2019cv02945
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Referring Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 0206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order advising plaintiff to respond to CHARLES EDEH and NIGERIAN CATHOLIC COMMUNITY AT ST. JEROME CATHOLIC CHURCH's Motion to Dismiss #11 by 1/3/20 or Court may deem matter as conceded. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to: EMMANUEL AGBARA, 4017 5th Street, NW, Washington, DC 20011. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/27/19. (DJS)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Advising pro se Plaintiff of his obligation to follow the FRCP, Local Rules and orders of the court. Failure to adhere to these rules or orders may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to: EMMANUEL AGBARA, 4017 5th Street, NW, Washington, DC 20011. (See order for further details). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/27/19. (DJS)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction & Failure to State a Claim by CHARLES EDEH, NIGERIAN CATHOLIC COMMUNITY AT ST. JEROME CATHOLIC CHURCH (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Graves, Carmiece)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Carmiece T. Graves on behalf of CHARLES EDEH, NIGERIAN CATHOLIC COMMUNITY AT ST. JEROME CATHOLIC CHURCH (Graves, Carmiece)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NIGERIAN CATHOLIC COMMUNITY AT ST. JEROME CATHOLIC CHURCH served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019; KINSLEY KELECHI OGIDEH served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. (ztth)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. EVELYN ONYENYI OKOJI served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/11/2019; LIVINITY OKPARAEKE served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019 (ztd)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. AT&T MOBILITY LLC served on 10/3/2019, answer due 10/24/2019 (ztd)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: AT&T Mobility's Motion #4 to Strike Complaint, or in the Alternative, to Consolidate or Stay is hereby GRANTED. This action is hereby STAYED pending resolution of AT&T's motion to compel arbitration in 19cv-1823-TSC (AGBARA v. AT&T MOBILITY LLC et al). The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: EMMANUEL AGBARA, 4017 5th Street, NW, Washington, DC 20011. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/25/19. (DJS)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case directly reassigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan as related. Judge Amit P. Mehta is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Arthur Coleman on behalf of AT&T MOBILITY LLC (Coleman, Brian)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, or, in the Alternative,, MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Compel Arbitration, MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Stay by AT&T MOBILITY LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hand, Joie). Added MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Stay on 10/22/2019 (zjf).
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AT&T MOBILITY LLC (Hand, Joie)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Joie Christine Hand on behalf of AT&T MOBILITY LLC (Hand, Joie)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AT&T MOBILITY LLC, CHARLES EDEH, NIGERIAN CATHOLIC COMMUNITY AT ST. JEROME CATHOLIC CHURCH, KINSLEY KELECHI OGIDEH, EVELYN ONYENYI OKOJI, LIVINITY OKPARAEKE ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616100857) with Jury Demand filed by EMMANUEL AGBARA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Summons (5) Issued as to AT&T MOBILITY LLC, CHARLES EDEH, NIGERIAN CATHOLIC COMMUNITY AT ST. JEROME CATHOLIC CHURCH, KINSLEY KELECHI OGIDEH, EVELYN ONYENYI OKOJI,. (jf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AGBARA v. AT&T MOBILITY LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMMANUEL AGBARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KINSLEY KELECHI OGIDEH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIVINITY OKPARAEKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T MOBILITY LLC
Represented By: Brian Arthur Coleman
Represented By: Joie Christine Hand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES EDEH
Represented By: Carmiece T. Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIGERIAN CATHOLIC COMMUNITY AT ST. JEROME CATHOLIC CHURCH
Represented By: Carmiece T. Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVELYN ONYENYI OKOJI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?