COOKEVILLE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER AUTHORITY et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: ROBERT WOOD JOHNSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC., COOKEVILLE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER AUTHORITY, TRI-CITY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT, SAN ANTONIO REGIONAL HOSPITAL, MISSISSIPPI BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER, INC., REDLANDS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, NICHOLAS H. NOYES MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC., WYCKOFF HEIGHTS MEDICAL CENTER, ST. JOSEPH'S UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, TRINITAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, KAWEAH DELTA HEALTH CARE DISTRICT, POMONA VALLEY HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., MAURY REGIONAL HOSPITAL, COOPER HEALTH SYSTEM and SLIDELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv02966
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: John D Bates
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 10/24/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/28/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/28/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/27/2019.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return Receipts for Certified Mail)(Carroll, Kelly)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
October 7, 2019 Case assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zmc)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by COOKEVILLE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER AUTHORITY, COOPER HEALTH SYSTEM, KAWEAH DELTA HEALTH CARE DISTRICT, MAURY REGIONAL HOSPITAL, MISSISSIPPI BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER, INC., NICHOLAS H. NOYES MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC., POMONA VALLEY HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, REDLANDS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ROBERT WOOD JOHNSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC., SAN ANTONIO REGIONAL HOSPITAL, SLIDELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., ST. JOSEPH'S UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, TRI-CITY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT, TRINITAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, WYCKOFF HEIGHTS MEDICAL CENTER (Carroll, Kelly)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6413279) filed by POMONA VALLEY HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, MAURY REGIONAL HOSPITAL, TRINITAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, COOKEVILLE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER AUTHORITY, ROBERT WOOD JOHNSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC., TRI-CITY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT, SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., COOPER HEALTH SYSTEM, WYCKOFF HEIGHTS MEDICAL CENTER, MISSISSIPPI BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER, INC., SLIDELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, KAWEAH DELTA HEALTH CARE DISTRICT, ST. JOSEPH'S UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, NICHOLAS H. NOYES MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC., SAN ANTONIO REGIONAL HOSPITAL, REDLANDS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons to Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services, #4 Summons to Hon. William P. Barr, Attorney General of the United States, #5 Summons to Hon. Jessie K. Liu, United States Attorney for the District of Columbia, #6 Summons to Robert P. Charrow, General Counsel, United States Department of Health and Human Services)(Carroll, Kelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COOKEVILLE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER AUTHORITY et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT WOOD JOHNSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COOKEVILLE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER AUTHORITY
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRI-CITY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAN ANTONIO REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MISSISSIPPI BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REDLANDS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS H. NOYES MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WYCKOFF HEIGHTS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. JOSEPH'S UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRINITAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAWEAH DELTA HEALTH CARE DISTRICT
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: POMONA VALLEY HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC.
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAURY REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COOPER HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SLIDELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?