MONTANA ENVIRONMENTAL INFORMATION CENTER v. UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT
Plaintiff: MONTANA ENVIRONMENTAL INFORMATION CENTER
Defendant: UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT
Case Number: 1:2019cv02977
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/18/2019. (hmc)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a complaint and an answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the report on or before December 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/18/2019. (lctnm3)
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT.(Cirino, Paul)
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT served on 10/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mailing, #2 Exhibit - Certified Mail Receipts)(Hernandez, Shiloh)
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mailing, #2 Exhibit - Certified Mail Receipts)(Hernandez, Shiloh)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/17/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mailing, #2 Exhibit - Certified Mail Receipts)(Hernandez, Shiloh)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT (Cirino, Paul)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Shiloh Silvan Hernandez on behalf of MONTANA ENVIRONMENTAL INFORMATION CENTER (Hernandez, Shiloh)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel Shiloh S. Hernandez shall promptly register for this Court's CM/ECF system. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/8/2019. (lctnm3)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/8/2019. (lctnm3)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zmc)
October 8, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmc)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MONTANA ENVIRONMENTAL INFORMATION CENTER (Mellgren, John)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Shiloh S. Hernandez, :Firm- Western Environmental Law Center, :Address- 103 Reeder's Alley, Helena, Montana 59601. Phone No. - 406-204-4861. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6415798. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MONTANA ENVIRONMENTAL INFORMATION CENTER (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mellgren, John)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6415714) filed by MONTANA ENVIRONMENTAL INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons U.S. Office of Surface Mining and Enforcement, #3 Summons U.S. Attorney District of DC, #4 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(Mellgren, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MONTANA ENVIRONMENTAL INFORMATION CENTER v. UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONTANA ENVIRONMENTAL INFORMATION CENTER
Represented By: John R. Mellgren
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?