BYRNES v. ALLERGAN, INC.
Plaintiff: MAUREEN BYRNES
Defendant: ALLERGAN, INC., ALLERGAN PLC, ALLERGAN USA, INC, MCGHAN MEDICAL CORPORATION and INAMED CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv03013
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendants shall file an Answer or other responsive pleading 60 days after the earliest of the following events: a. The JPML enters an order denying the currently pending motion to transfer; orb. The JPML grants the motion to transfer and Plaintiff files an amended consolidated complaint in accordance with the schedule set by the MDL judge, unless the MDL judge sets a different deadline. The parties are reminded that the Court does not accept extensions by stipulation. In the future, please file a consent motion to extend any deadline, along with a proposed order. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/3/2019. (lccrc3)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by ALLERGAN, INC.. (Coots, John) Modified on 11/27/2019 (ztd). Modified on 11/27/2019 (ztd).
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John Chadwick Coots on behalf of ALLERGAN, INC. (Coots, John)
October 10, 2019 SUMMONS Not Issued as to ALLERGAN PLC, ALLERGAN USA, INC (zmc)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ALLERGAN, INC.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
October 10, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmc)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Maureen Byrnes with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6433020) filed by Maureen Byrnes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Nace, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BYRNES v. ALLERGAN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAUREEN BYRNES
Represented By: Matthew Andrew Nace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN, INC.
Represented By: John Chadwick Coots
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN USA, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCGHAN MEDICAL CORPORATION
Represented By: John Chadwick Coots
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INAMED CORPORATION
Represented By: John Chadwick Coots
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?