CURRY v. FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
Plaintiff: MATTHEW CURRY
Defendant: FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv03021
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Relief from Judgment by MATTHEW CURRY (Attachment: #1 Supplement)(zsb)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. This is a final appealable Order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/8/19. (zmd)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/8/19. (zmd)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by MATTHEW CURRY.(zrdj)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MATTHEW CURRY. (zmd)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION filed by MATTHEW CURRY.(zmd)
October 9, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 10/9/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CURRY v. FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW CURRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?