STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY v. ACCURATE INSULATION, LLC et al
Plaintiff: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Defendant: WINSTONS OF NORTHERN VIRGINIA, INC. and ACCURATE INSULATION, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03085
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Crossclaim #13 by WINSTONS OF NORTHERN VIRGINIA, INC..(Stallard, Kenneth)
November 26, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended pleadings/joinder of parties due by 1/31/2020; fact depositions to be completed by 4/1/2020; plaintiff's expert disclosure due by 4/15/2020; defendants' expert disclosure due by 5/15/2020; rebuttal expert reports due by 6/1/2020; discovery due by 7/1/2020; joint status report due by 7/1/2020; summary judgment motions due by 7/31/2020; oppositions to motion for summary judgment due by 8/21/2020; replies in support of summary judgment due by 8/28/2020. (tg)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ISSUING, upon consideration of the #15 Joint Meet and Confer Report, the following SCHEDULING ORDER to control the timing of proceedings in this matter: (1) by January 31, 2020, the parties shall make any amendments to the pleadings and join any parties; (2) by April 1, 2020, fact depositions shall be completed; (3) by April 15, 2020, the plaintiff shall disclose any experts; (4) by May 15, 2020, defendants shall disclose any experts; (5) by June 1, 2020, the parties shall file any rebuttal expert reports; (6) by July 1, 2020, all discovery, including expert depositions, shall be completed and the parties shall file a joint status report advising the court whether (a) they are requesting referral to a magistrate or to the courts alternative dispute resolution program for mediation, or (b) dispositive motions are anticipated; (7) by July 31, 2020, motions for summary judgment shall be filed; (8) by August 21, 2020, oppositions to motions for summary judgment shall be filed; (9) by August 28, 2020, reply briefs in support of summary judgment shall be filed. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 26, 2019. (lcbah2)
November 26, 2019 Filing 15 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Luccaro, Daniel)
November 13, 2019 Filing 14 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests Rule 7.1 Disclosure by ACCURATE INSULATION, LLC (Ayd, Jessica)
November 13, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Crossclaim #6 , CROSSCLAIM against WINSTONS OF NORTHERN VIRGINIA, INC. by ACCURATE INSULATION, LLC.(Ayd, Jessica)
November 13, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by ACCURATE INSULATION, LLC.(Ayd, Jessica)
November 11, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ACCURATE INSULATION, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Goorevitz, Tamara)
November 11, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. WINSTONS OF NORTHERN VIRGINIA, INC. served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019 (Kurtz, Chad) Modified on 11/13/2019 to correct event and add service and answer due date (zrdj).
November 11, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ACCURATE INSULATION, LLC served on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019 (Kurtz, Chad) Modified on 11/13/2019 to correct event and add service and answer due date (zrdj).
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Luccaro on behalf of STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY (Luccaro, Daniel)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WINSTONS OF NORTHERN VIRGINIA, INC. (Stallard, Kenneth)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against ACCURATE INSULATION, LLC by WINSTONS OF NORTHERN VIRGINIA, INC..(Stallard, Kenneth)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the plaintiff's #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Daniel J. Luccaro may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing the plaintiff in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 25, 2019. (lcbah2)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Daniel J. Luccaro, :Firm- Cozen O'Connor, :Address- dluccaro@cozen.com. Phone No. - 2156656968. Fax No. - 2157012368 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6477340. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Luccaro, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kurtz, Chad)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 21, 2019. (lcbah2)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to ACCURATE INSULATION, LLC, WINSTONS OF NORTHERN VIRGINIA, INC.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
October 17, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zmc)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY (Kurtz, Chad)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6448004) filed by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Accurate Insulation, LLC, #3 Summons Winstons of Northern Virginia, Inc.)(Kurtz, Chad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY v. ACCURATE INSULATION, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: Chad E. Kurtz
Represented By: Daniel J. Luccaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WINSTONS OF NORTHERN VIRGINIA, INC.
Represented By: Kenneth Gordon Stallard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACCURATE INSULATION, LLC
Represented By: Jessica J. Ayd
Represented By: Tamara B. Goorevitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?