CHIEN v. MORRIS et al
Plaintiff: ANDREW CHIEN
Defendant: MARA L RANSOM, DENIS BRAND MORRIS and MARA L. RANSOM
Case Number: 1:2019cv03101
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Filing 32 REPLY to opposition to motion re #24 MOTION to Strike #20 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by ANDREW CHIEN. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(ztd)
June 10, 2020 Filing 31 RESPONSE re #27 Reply to opposition to Motion filed by ANDREW CHIEN. (ztd)
June 10, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Continue by ANDREW CHIEN (ztd)
June 10, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (ztd) Modified event title on 6/12/2020 (znmw).
June 2, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Reply to #24 due by 7/22/2020. (dot)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Plaintiff's #24 Motion to Strike and Defendants' #28 Response to that Motion to Strike. Plaintiff shall file any reply in support of his Motion to Strike by no later than JUNE 22, 2020. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff's address of record and to the address provided on his most recent Motion, ECF No. 24. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 2, 2020. (lccck1)
June 1, 2020 Filing 28 RESPONSE re #24 MOTION to Strike #20 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #26 Supplemental Memorandum filed by DENIS BRAND MORRIS, MARA L. RANSOM. (Tepe, Sean)
June 1, 2020 Filing 27 REPLY to opposition to motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by DENIS BRAND MORRIS, MARA L. RANSOM. (Tepe, Sean)
May 15, 2020 Filing 26 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #20 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by ANDREW CHIEN. (ztd)
May 15, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE (Judicial) by ANDREW CHIEN (ztd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2020: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Appendix) (ztd).
May 15, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Strike #20 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by ANDREW CHIEN (ztd)
May 15, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE re #20 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by ANDREW CHIEN. (ztd)
May 15, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for CM/ECF Password by ANDREW CHIEN (ztd)
May 12, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to #20 due by 5/18/2020. (dot)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER requiring Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's #20 Motion by no later than May 18, 2020. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff's address of record and to the address provided on his most recent Motion, ECF No. #18 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 12, 2020. (lccck1)
May 4, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by DENIS BRAND MORRIS, MARA L. RANSOM (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Wheat, #2 Declaration of Van Horn)(Tepe, Sean)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Plaintiff's #2 #6 #14 #18 Motions for CM/ECF Password. Pursuant to Local Rule of Civil Procedure 5.4(b), a "pro se party may obtain a CM/ECF user name and password from the Clerk with leave of Court." The decision whether to grant the motion "is within the discretion of the judge to whom the case is assigned." The Motion must describe the party's access to the internet and certify that he "either has successfully completed the entire Clerk's Office on-line tutorial or has been permitted to file electronically in other federal courts." LCvR 5.4(b)(2). In his first #2 Motion, Plaintiff indicated that he had been able to use CM/ECF in the United States District Court for the District of Connecticut and in an unspecified United States Court of Appeals. None of Plaintiff's Motions describe his internet access. The Court DENIES Plaintiff's Motions. First, as noted above, Plaintiff has not met the requirements of LCvR 5.4(b)(2). Second, Plaintiff has demonstrated sufficient ability to file pleadings on the docket and to access the docket without having a CM/ECF password. Each of the Court's Orders and Minute Orders in this case specify that "[t]he Clerk shall mail a copy of this Minute Order to Plaintiff at his address of record," and the record reflects that a copy of each Order and Minute Order has been mailed to Plaintiff at his address of record. Defendants similarly must ensure that each filing is properly served upon Plaintiff under the Federal and Local Rules. If Plaintiff's address of record, which per his earliest submissions in this case is 665 Ellsworth Ave., New Haven, CT, 06511 (see, e.g., ECF Nos. #1 , #2 ) is incorrect, he shall file a notice to correct it. Moreover, Plaintiff indicates in his most recent #18 Motion that he has access to the docket via PACER and has been able to monitor it that way. Plaintiff also raises concerns regarding the current situation and stay-at-home orders for COVID-19. The Court notes that the courthouse is still open to litigants or those delivering papers on behalf of litigants, although the courthouse now requires that visitors wear personal protective equipment (and will endeavor to provide them with that equipment if they do not have it) under certain circumstances. See Standing Order No. 20-26 (BAH), available at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/coronavirus-covid-19-response-information-and-announcements. The Clerk's Office is similarly open and accepting papers for filing at this time. To further address Plaintiff's concerns regarding the deadlines for filings, the Court will take into account Plaintiff's pro se status and lack of CM/ECF access in setting deadlines when appropriate under the Federal and Local Rules of Civil Procedure. Accordingly, the Court DENIES Plaintiff's #2 #6 #14 #18 Motions. The Clerk shall mail a copy of this Minute Order to Plaintiff at his address of record and at the address provided on his most recent #18 Motion. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 29, 2020. (lccck1)
April 27, 2020 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against DENIS BRAND MORRIS, MARA L. RANSOM filed by ANDREW CHIEN.(ztd)
April 27, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for CM/ECF Password by ANDREW CHIEN (ztd)
April 21, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Renewed Motion to Dismiss due by 5/4/2020. Response due by 5/18/2020. Reply due by 6/1/2020. (dot)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Plaintiff's #15 Motion for First Amendment of Complaint. Plaintiff seeks to amend the Complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(2). Pursuant to that rule, which allows Plaintiff to amend his Complaint once as a matter of course within 21 days after service of a motion under Rule 12(b), Plaintiff may amend his Complaint. Plaintiff shall file on the docket a complete version of his First Amended Complaint on or before APRIL 27, 2020. Accordingly, the Court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and VACATES the MAY 4, 2020 deadline for Defendants to file any reply in support of that Motion. The Court does not vacate the May 4, 2020 deadline for Plaintiff to file any reply in support of his #13 Motion for Recusal. If Defendants would like to renew their Motion to Dismiss in light of the First Amended Complaint, they shall do so by MAY 4, 2020. If Defendants file a Motion to Dismiss based on the First Amended Complaint, Plaintiff shall file any opposition by no later than MAY 18, 2020, and Defendants shall file any reply on or before JUNE 1, 2020. The Clerk shall mail a copy of this Minute Order to Plaintiff at his address of record. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 21, 2020. (lccck1)
April 20, 2020 Filing 17 Memorandum in opposition to re #13 MOTION for Recusal filed by DENIS BRAND MORRIS, MARA L. RANSOM. (Tepe, Sean)
April 17, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ANDREW CHIEN. (ztd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/17/2020: #1 Memorandum in Support) (ztd).
April 17, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by ANDREW CHIEN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(ztd)
April 17, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for CM/ECF Password by ANDREW CHIEN (ztd)
April 1, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to #12 due by 4/20/2020. Defendants' Reply to #12 due by 5/4/2020. Defendants' Response to #13 due by 4/20/20. Plaintiff's Reply to #13 due by 5/4/20. (dot)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Defendants' #12 Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's #13 Motion for Recusal. The Court accordingly sets the following briefing schedule: Plaintiff shall file his response to the #12 Motion to Dismiss by no later than APRIL 20, 2020. Defendants shall file any reply by no later than MAY 4, 2020. Moreover, Defendants shall file any response to the #13 Motion for Recusal by no later than APRIL 20, 2020. Plaintiff shall file any reply by no later than MAY 4, 2020. The Clerk shall mail a copy of this Minute Order to Plaintiff at his address of record. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 1, 2020. (lccck1)
March 30, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Recusal by ANDREW CHIEN (ztd)
March 30, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by DENIS BRAND MORRIS, MARA L. RANSOM (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Van Horn, #2 Declaration of Wheat, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Tepe, Sean)
February 11, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer/Responsive pleading due by 3/30/2020. (dot)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Defendants' #11 Consent Motion to Extend Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading, which is the second request for an extension of this deadline from Defendants. Defendants explain that there is new counsel representing them and request a 45-day extension for that counsel to become familiar with this suit and a related suit brought by Plaintiff against the SEC. New counsel for Defendants also has numerous other obligations, such as depositions in other cases, in the coming weeks. Plaintiff has consented to this request. As Defendants note, this was not filed four days in advance of the deadline due to the very recent transition of counsel. However, in light of the circumstances and with Plaintiff's consent, the Court shall GRANT Defendants' Motion. Accordingly, Defendants shall file their responsive pleading by no later than MARCH 30, 2020. The Clerk shall mail a copy of this Minute Order to Plaintiff at his address of record. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 11, 2020. (lccck1)
February 10, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond by DENIS BRAND MORRIS, MARA L. RANSOM (Tepe, Sean)
February 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Sean Michael Tepe on behalf of DENIS BRAND MORRIS, MARA L. RANSOM Substituting for attorney Scott Sroka (Tepe, Sean)
January 7, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 due by 2/12/2020. (dot)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Defendants' #9 Consent Motion to Extend Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading. Defendants seek to extend the time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint until February 12, 2020. Defendants indicate that Plaintiff does not oppose the request. Accordingly, for good cause shown and with the parties' consent, the Court shall GRANT the Motion. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint no later than FEBRUARY 12, 2020. The Clerk shall mail a copy of this Minute Order to Plaintiff at his address of record. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 7, 2020. (lccck1)
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by DENIS BRAND MORRIS, MARA L. RANSOM (Sroka, Scott)
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to DENIS BRAND MORRIS, MARA L. RANSOM (ztd)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT by ANDREW CHIEN. (ztd) Modified on 12/23/2019 (ztd).
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 Second MOTION for CM/ECF Password by ANDREW CHIEN (eg)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DENIS BRAND MORRIS served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019; MARA L. RANSOM served on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/7/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/7/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/6/2020.) (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(eg) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/6/2019) (zeg).
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge for All Purposes by ANDREW CHIEN.. (eg)
October 29, 2019 SUMMONS (5) REISSUED as to DENIS BRAND MORRIS (2 issued for Denis Morris), MARA L RANSOM, and non-parties U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ztd)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/23/19. (DM)
October 17, 2019 SUMMONS (4) Issued as to DENIS BRAND MORRIS, MARA L RANSOM, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (ztth)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for CM/ECF Password by ANDREW CHIEN. (ztth)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DENIS BRAND MORRIS, MARA L RANSOM (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090) with Jury Demand filed by ANDREW CHIEN. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ztth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHIEN v. MORRIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARA L RANSOM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENIS BRAND MORRIS
Represented By: Scott Leeson Sroka
Represented By: Sean Michael Tepe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARA L. RANSOM
Represented By: Scott Leeson Sroka
Represented By: Sean Michael Tepe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW CHIEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?