TRANSPORTATION TRADES DEPARTMENT, AFL-CIO et al v. NATIONAL MEDIATION BOARD
Plaintiff: COMMUNICATIONS WORKERS OF AMERICA, TRANSPORTATION TRADES DEPARTMENT, AFL-CIO, BROTHERHOOD OF RAILROAD SIGNALMEN, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS, TRANSPORT WORKERS UNION OF AMERICA, NATIONAL CONFERENCE OF FIREMEN & OILERS DISTRICT OF LOCAL 32BJ, SEIU, AIR LINE PILOTS ASSOCIATION INTERNATIONAL, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) - TRANSPORTATION DIVISION, AMERICAN TRAIN DISPATCHERS ASSOCIATION, TRANSPORTATION COMMUNICATIONS UNION - IAM, BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION/IBT, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) - MECHANICAL DIVISION, ASSOCIATION OF FLIGHT ATTENDANTS-CWA, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS and BROTHERHOOD OF LOCOMOTIVE ENGINEERS AND TRAINMEN DIVISION/IBT RAIL CONFERENCE
Defendant: NATIONAL MEDIATION BOARD
Case Number: 1:2019cv03107
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL MEDIATION BOARD served on 10/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Proof of Service)(Bird, Maria Antonia)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/22/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Proof of Service)(Bird, Maria Antonia)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/22/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Proof of Service)(Bird, Maria Antonia)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL MEDIATION BOARD, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
October 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (adh, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AIR LINE PILOTS ASSOCIATION INTERNATIONAL, AMERICAN TRAIN DISPATCHERS ASSOCIATION, ASSOCIATION OF FLIGHT ATTENDANTS-CWA, BROTHERHOOD OF LOCOMOTIVE ENGINEERS AND TRAINMEN DIVISION/IBT RAIL CONFERENCE, BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION/IBT, BROTHERHOOD OF RAILROAD SIGNALMEN, COMMUNICATIONS WORKERS OF AMERICA, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) - MECHANICAL DIVISION, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) - TRANSPORTATION DIVISION, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS, NATIONAL CONFERENCE OF FIREMEN & OILERS DISTRICT OF LOCAL 32BJ, SEIU, TRANSPORT WORKERS UNION OF AMERICA, TRANSPORTATION COMMUNICATIONS UNION - IAM, TRANSPORTATION TRADES DEPARTMENT, AFL-CIO (Bird, Maria Antonia)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria Antonia Elizabeth Bird on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bird, Maria Antonia)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL MEDIATION BOARD ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6454246) filed by INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) - TRANSPORTATION DIVISION, BROTHERHOOD OF RAILROAD SIGNALMEN, AIR LINE PILOTS ASSOCIATION INTERNATIONAL, TRANSPORTATION TRADES DEPARTMENT, AFL-CIO, NATIONAL CONFERENCE OF FIREMEN & OILERS DISTRICT OF LOCAL 32BJ, SEIU, BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION/IBT, AMERICAN TRAIN DISPATCHERS ASSOCIATION, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS, TRANSPORT WORKERS UNION OF AMERICA, TRANSPORTATION COMMUNICATIONS UNION - IAM, COMMUNICATIONS WORKERS OF AMERICA, ASSOCIATION OF FLIGHT ATTENDANTS-CWA, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) - MECHANICAL DIVISION, BROTHERHOOD OF LOCOMOTIVE ENGINEERS AND TRAINMEN DIVISION/IBT RAIL CONFERENCE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for the U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, #3 Summons for the Attorney General for the United States, #4 Summons for the National Mediation Board)(Bartos, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRANSPORTATION TRADES DEPARTMENT, AFL-CIO et al v. NATIONAL MEDIATION BOARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMUNICATIONS WORKERS OF AMERICA
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Represented By: Maria Antonia Elizabeth Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRANSPORTATION TRADES DEPARTMENT, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Represented By: Maria Antonia Elizabeth Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROTHERHOOD OF RAILROAD SIGNALMEN
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Represented By: Maria Antonia Elizabeth Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Represented By: Maria Antonia Elizabeth Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRANSPORT WORKERS UNION OF AMERICA
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Represented By: Maria Antonia Elizabeth Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL CONFERENCE OF FIREMEN & OILERS DISTRICT OF LOCAL 32BJ, SEIU
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Represented By: Maria Antonia Elizabeth Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIR LINE PILOTS ASSOCIATION INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Represented By: Maria Antonia Elizabeth Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) - TRANSPORTATION DIVISION
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Represented By: Maria Antonia Elizabeth Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN TRAIN DISPATCHERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Represented By: Maria Antonia Elizabeth Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRANSPORTATION COMMUNICATIONS UNION - IAM
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Represented By: Maria Antonia Elizabeth Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION/IBT
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Represented By: Maria Antonia Elizabeth Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SHEET METAL, AIR, RAIL AND TRANSPORTATION WORKERS (SMART) - MECHANICAL DIVISION
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Represented By: Maria Antonia Elizabeth Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASSOCIATION OF FLIGHT ATTENDANTS-CWA
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Represented By: Maria Antonia Elizabeth Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Represented By: Maria Antonia Elizabeth Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROTHERHOOD OF LOCOMOTIVE ENGINEERS AND TRAINMEN DIVISION/IBT RAIL CONFERENCE
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bartos
Represented By: Maria Antonia Elizabeth Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL MEDIATION BOARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?