MARIN TRIANA v. OAS GROUP, INC. et al
Plaintiff: RAUL MARIN TRIANA
Defendant: GUAN YUN ZHU, GARY S NGO, PDDC, INC., EASON ZHU, OAS GROUP, INC. and GARY S. NGO
Case Number: 1:2019cv03120
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Scheduling Conference is hereby set for 1/14/20 at 10:45 am in Courtroom 9. No later than 1/6/20 the parties shall file their joint Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting, pursuant to Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 16.3. The Report shall include a proposed Scheduling Order in the format found on Judge Chutkan's court webpage, along with any proposed changes which shall be highlighted. On the same day that the parties file their Rule 26 report and proposed Scheduling Order, the parties shall also email a Word version of the proposed order to Chambers. When proposing deadlines, the parties shall avoid proposing a schedule that contains submission of simultaneous dispositive cross-motions. In addition to the requirements under the Federal and Local Rules, the parties' report shall contain a succinct summary of the case and the statutory basis for all causes of action and defenses. Counsel who attend the Scheduling Conference must be sufficiently familiar with the case to answer any questions which arise and hold the authority to make stipulations and admissions about all matters that can reasonably be anticipated for discussion. Parties are encouraged to attend, but are not required to do so. Separate Reports will be stricken, sua sponte. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/13/19. (DJS)
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by GARY S. NGO, OAS GROUP, INC., PDDC, INC., GUAN YUN ZHU.(Amourgis, Edward)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael Hsur, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6636158. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GARY S. NGO, OAS GROUP, INC., PDDC, INC., GUAN YUN ZHU (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Amourgis, Edward)
December 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 12/19/2019. (tb)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff filed this action on 10/17/2019. It appears from the record that Plaintiff effectuated service of process on the Defendants as late as 11/2/2019, but Defendants have yet to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff SHOW CAUSE, in writing, on or before 12/19/19, why this action should not be dismissed. Plaintiff's failure to satisfactorily respond to the present order by 12/19/19, may result in the dismissal of this action, without further notice, for failure to prosecute. See Local Civil Rule 83.23. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/6/19. (DJS)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. PDDC, INC. served on 11/2/2019, answer due 11/23/2019 (Zelikovitz, Justin)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GUAN YUN ZHU served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019 (Zelikovitz, Justin)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GARY S NGO served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019 (Zelikovitz, Justin)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OAS GROUP, INC. served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019 (Zelikovitz, Justin)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to GARY S NGO, OAS GROUP, INC., PDDC, INC., GUAN YUN ZHU. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
October 18, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmc)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6459092) filed by RAUL MARIN TRIANA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons (4))(Zelikovitz, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARIN TRIANA v. OAS GROUP, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUAN YUN ZHU
Represented By: Edward Amourgis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY S NGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PDDC, INC.
Represented By: Edward Amourgis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EASON ZHU
Represented By: Edward Amourgis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OAS GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Edward Amourgis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY S. NGO
Represented By: Edward Amourgis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAUL MARIN TRIANA
Represented By: Justin Derek Zelikovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?