PAGE v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Plaintiff: CARTER PAGE
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Case Number: 1:2019cv03149
Filed: October 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION of Dismissal by CARTER PAGE. (PAGE, CARTER)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Thomas M. Buchanan terminated. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 8/18/2020. (jag)
August 17, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance and Pro Se Status by CARTER PAGE (PAGE, CARTER) Modified on 8/18/2020 to correct docket event/text (zjf).
August 11, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CARTER PAGE (Buchanan, Thomas)
August 4, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 9/11/2020. (zgdf)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER, granting, for good cause shown, Plaintiff's #16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re Defendant's #9 Partial Motion to Dismiss and for Partial Summary Judgment, nunc pro tunc. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's #9 Motion on or before 9/11/2020. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 08/04/2020. (lckbj2)
July 29, 2020 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Partial MOTION for Summary Judgment by CARTER PAGE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Buchanan, Thomas)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the Administrative Stay in this matter is LIFTED, and that a telephonic status conference is set for 8/11/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Dial-in information will be provided to counsel by e-mail. Information on public access to this proceeding can be found on the Court's website. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/28/2020. (jag)
July 15, 2020 Filing 15 Joint STATUS REPORT by CARTER PAGE. (Buchanan, Thomas)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING, for good cause shown, #14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #9 Partial Motion to Dismiss and for Partial Summary Judgment. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall respond to #9 on or before 7/29/2020. In light of the representations in the parties motion regarding their ongoing settlement negotiations, it is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before 7/15/2020 regarding the status of their settlement efforts. In the interest of justice and judicial efficiency, it is FURTHER ORDERED that the Court's consideration of the #9 Motion is ADMINISTRATIVELY STAYED during the pendency of the parties' settlement negotiations; this administrative stay does not impact any of the deadlines set in this Minute Order. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/26/2020. (jag)
May 18, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Partial MOTION for Summary Judgment by CARTER PAGE (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Buchanan, Thomas)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, #13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #9 Partial Motion to Dismiss and Partial Motion for Summary Judgment. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's #9 Motion on or before 5/30/2020. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 3/25/2020. (jag)
March 25, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Partial Motion to Dismiss and Partial Motion for Summary Judgment by CARTER PAGE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Buchanan, Thomas)
March 25, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Buchanan on behalf of CARTER PAGE (Buchanan, Thomas)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Partially Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #9 Partial Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment, nunc pro tunc. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's response to #9 is due on or before 3/31/2020. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/4/2020. (jag)
January 31, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by CARTER PAGE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(PAGE, CARTER)
January 6, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion to Dismiss/Partial Summary Judgment motion due by 1/31/2020. (hs)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER advising plaintiff to respond to Defendants #9 motion to dismiss in part and a motion for partial summary judgment on or before January 31, 2020, or Court may deem matter as conceded. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/26/2020. (jag)
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 Partial MOTION to Dismiss , Partial MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: #1 Declaration October 2018 David M. Hardy, #2 Declaration of Vanessa R. Brinkmann (OIP), #3 Declaration of Priscilla Jones (OIP Appeals), #4 Declaration of Kevin G. Tiernan (NSD), #5 Declaration of Paul P. Colborn (OLC), #6 Declaration of Amanda Jones (CRM), #7 Declaration of Nicole Moore (EOUSA), #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Powell, Amy)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of Defendant's #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and Plaintiff's #9 Opposition thereto, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 12/23/2019. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/4/2019. (jag)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to opposition to motion re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Powell, Amy)
November 29, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer in Opposition filed by CARTER PAGE. (PAGE, CARTER)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Powell, Amy)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy E. Powell on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Powell, Amy)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/28/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/28/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/27/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/28/2019 (ztd)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #3 Motion for CM/ECF Password. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/29/2019. (JAG)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for CM/ECF Password by CARTER PAGE (jf)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/22/2019. (jag)
October 21, 2019 SUMMONS (3) Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf)
October 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616101108) filed by CARTER PAGE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PAGE v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARTER PAGE
Represented By: Thomas M. Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Amy E. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?