HART et al v. UNITED STATES POST OFFICE CUSTOMS HOUSE
Plaintiff: Naomi Hart, ROGER V. HART and ROGER HART
Defendant: United States Post Office Customs House
Case Number: 1:2019cv03165
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #3 Motion Set Answer Deadline. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 1/6/2020. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 11/15/2019. (jag)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 11/15/2019. (jag)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Establish Deadline to Respond to Complaint by UNITED STATES POST OFFICE CUSTOMS HOUSE (Cohen, Jason)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to Counsel/Party (zmc)
October 24, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zmc)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2019SC3004856 (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by UNITED STATES POST OFFICE CUSTOMS HOUSE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Documents from Superior Court as Shown, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cohen, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HART et al v. UNITED STATES POST OFFICE CUSTOMS HOUSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROGER V. HART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROGER HART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Post Office Customs House
Represented By: Jason Todd Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?