SIMPSON v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON et al
Plaintiff: JESSE RUSSELL SIMPSON
Defendant: CHAPLAIN OF CANAAN USP, IAN CONNORS, C. GOMEZ, RUDY, WARDEN OF OKLAHOMA CITY FTC, FBOP GENERAL COUNSEL, V MOSER, FULLEN, WAUGHEN, LESH, DULLA, BRIAN PRICE, BAEKASZI, E. DODRILL, TEJERA, CHAPLAIN(S) OF OKLAHOMA CITY FTC, D.J. HARMON, B. PLAVI, STADTLER, GIALONE, M. WOLEVER, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON, WARDEN OF CANAAN USP and V. MOSER
Case Number: 1:2019cv03173
Filed: October 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Prison Condition (Other)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 16 ERRATA by BAEKASZI, CHAPLAIN OF CANAAN USP, CHAPLAIN(S) OF OKLAHOMA CITY FTC, IAN CONNORS, E. DODRILL, DULLA, FBOP GENERAL COUNSEL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON, FULLEN, GIALONE, C. GOMEZ, D.J. HARMON, LESH, V. MOSER, B. PLAVI, BRIAN PRICE, RUDY, STADTLER, TEJERA, WARDEN OF CANAAN USP, WARDEN OF OKLAHOMA CITY FTC, WAUGHEN, M. WOLEVER #7 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION to Transfer Case filed by WAUGHEN, LESH, FBOP GENERAL COUNSEL, FULLEN, WARDEN OF CANAAN USP, C. GOMEZ, E. DODRILL, D.J. HARMON, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON, IAN CONNORS, WARDEN OF OKLAHOMA CITY FTC, B. PLAVI, CHAPLAIN OF CANAAN USP, DULLA, CHAPLAIN(S) OF OKLAHOMA CITY FTC, BAEKASZI, V. MOSER, RUDY, STADTLER, TEJERA, BRIAN PRICE, GIALONE, M. WOLEVER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Chang, William)
December 17, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to opposition to motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION to Transfer Case filed by BAEKASZI, CHAPLAIN OF CANAAN USP, CHAPLAIN(S) OF OKLAHOMA CITY FTC, IAN CONNORS, E. DODRILL, DULLA, FBOP GENERAL COUNSEL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON, FULLEN, GIALONE, C. GOMEZ, D.J. HARMON, LESH, V. MOSER, B. PLAVI, BRIAN PRICE, RUDY, STADTLER, TEJERA, WARDEN OF CANAAN USP, WARDEN OF OKLAHOMA CITY FTC, WAUGHEN, M. WOLEVER. (Chang, William)
December 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address by JESSE RUSSELL SIMPSON (eg)
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JESSE RUSSELL SIMPSON (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Memorandum in Support)(jf)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Court's November 14, 2019 Minute Order, the Plaintiff's #11 Motion to Extend Time to Reply is moot. The Court granted Plaintiff until December 10, 2019, to file his Reply to Defendants' #8 Opposition to his #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 25, 2019. (lccjn1)
November 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by William J. Chang on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney JOSHUA ROGERS (Chang, William)
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION to Transfer Case by BAEKASZI, CHAPLAIN OF CANAAN USP, CHAPLAIN(S) OF OKLAHOMA CITY FTC, IAN CONNORS, E. DODRILL, DULLA, FBOP GENERAL COUNSEL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON, FULLEN, GIALONE, C. GOMEZ, D.J. HARMON, LESH, V. MOSER, B. PLAVI, BRIAN PRICE, RUDY, STADTLER, TEJERA, WARDEN OF CANAAN USP, WARDEN OF OKLAHOMA CITY FTC, WAUGHEN, M. WOLEVER (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) Modified on 11/21/2019 (znmw).
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION to Dismiss by BAEKASZI, CHAPLAIN OF CANAAN USP, CHAPLAIN(S) OF OKLAHOMA CITY FTC, IAN CONNORS, E. DODRILL, DULLA, FBOP GENERAL COUNSEL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON, FULLEN, GIALONE, C. GOMEZ, D.J. HARMON, LESH, V. MOSER, B. PLAVI, BRIAN PRICE, RUDY, STADTLER, TEJERA, WARDEN OF CANAAN USP, WARDEN OF OKLAHOMA CITY FTC, WAUGHEN, M. WOLEVER (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) Modified on 11/21/2019 (znmw).
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by BAEKASZI, CHAPLAIN OF CANAAN USP, CHAPLAIN(S) OF OKLAHOMA CITY FTC, IAN CONNORS, E. DODRILL, DULLA, FBOP GENERAL COUNSEL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON, FULLEN, GIALONE, C. GOMEZ, D.J. HARMON, LESH, V. MOSER, B. PLAVI, BRIAN PRICE, RUDY, STADTLER, TEJERA, WARDEN OF CANAAN USP, WARDEN OF OKLAHOMA CITY FTC, WAUGHEN, M. WOLEVER. (Rogers, Joshua)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for Summary Judgment , MOTION to Transfer Case by BAEKASZI, CHAPLAIN OF CANAAN USP, CHAPLAIN(S) OF OKLAHOMA CITY FTC, IAN CONNORS, E. DODRILL, DULLA, FBOP GENERAL COUNSEL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON, FULLEN, GIALONE, C. GOMEZ, D.J. HARMON, LESH, V. MOSER, B. PLAVI, BRIAN PRICE, RUDY, STADTLER, TEJERA, WARDEN OF CANAAN USP, WARDEN OF OKLAHOMA CITY FTC, WAUGHEN, M. WOLEVER (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Declaration C. Bell, #4 Exhibit Bell Exh. A, #5 Exhibit Bell Exh. B, #6 Exhibit Bell Exh. C, #7 Exhibit Bell Exh. D, #8 Exhibit Bell Exh. E, #9 Exhibit Bell Exh. F, #10 Declaration K. Kelley, #11 Exhibit Kelley Exh. A, #12 Exhibit Kelley Exh. B, #13 Exhibit Kelley Exh. C, #14 Exhibit Kelley Exh. D, #15 Exhibit Kelley Exh. E, #16 Declaration D. Waughen, #17 Exhibit Waughen Exh. A, #18 Exhibit Waughen Exh. B, #19 Exhibit Waughen Exh. C, #20 Exhibit Waughen Exh. D, #21 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua)
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply by JESSE RUSSELL SIMPSON (jf)
November 14, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendants' response to #2 due by 11/19/2019. Reply due by 12/10/2019. (zcdw)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of Defendants' #6 Motion to Extend, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that (1) Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction on or before November 19, 2019, and (2) Plaintiff shall file his Reply to Defendants' response to his #2 Motion on or before December 10, 2019. The Court notes that this is Defendants' second request for an extension of time. Given that Plaintiff seeks a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction, any further extension requests will be strongly disfavored. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 14, 2019. (lccjn1)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (24) Issued as to All Defendants and U.S. Attorney General (zeg)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Court's October 31, 2019 Minute Order, it is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file his Reply to Defendants' response to his #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction on or before December 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 5, 2019. (lccjn1)
November 5, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff's reply due by 12/5/2019. (zcdw)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of Defendants' #4 Motion to Extend, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' Motion is GRANTED and that Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction on or before November 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 31, 2019. (lccjn1)
October 31, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response to #2 due by 11/15/2019. (zcdw)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by BAEKASZI, CHAPLAIN OF CANAAN USP, CHAPLAIN(S) OF OKLAHOMA CITY FTC, IAN CONNORS, E. DODRILL, DULLA, FBOP GENERAL COUNSEL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON, FULLEN, GIALONE, C. GOMEZ, D.J. HARMON, LESH, V MOSER, B. PLAVI, BRIAN PRICE, RUDY, STADTLER, TEJERA, WARDEN OF CANAAN USP, WARDEN OF OKLAHOMA CITY FTC, WAUGHEN, M. WOLEVER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of All Defendants (Rogers, Joshua)
October 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Response To #2 Motion For Temporary Restraining Order And Preliminary Injunction due by 11/1/2019. Plaintiffs Reply To Defendants' Response due by 11/15/2019. (mac)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to the Motion by November 1, 2019. In addition to a response on the Motion's merits, Defendants shall address (1) whether the Court has personal jurisdiction over all Defendants listed in the Plaintiff's #1 Complaint, (2) whether venue is proper in this district (and if not, whether the appropriate remedy is dismissal or transfer), and (3) the effect of parallel litigation in the Northern District of West Virginia (No. 1:19-cv-00068-TSK-MJA) or any other judicial district where Plaintiff may have filed related actions. Plaintiff shall reply to Defendants' response on or before November 15, 2019. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 25, 2019. (lccjn2)
October 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JESSE RUSSELL SIMPSON (jf)
October 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BAEKASZI, CHAPLAIN OF CANAAN USP, CHAPLAIN(S) OF OKLAHOMA CITY FTC, IAN CONNORS, E. DODRILL, DULLA, FBOP GENERAL COUNSEL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON, FULLEN, GIALONE, C. GOMEZ, D.J. HARMON, LESH, V MOSER, B. PLAVI, BRIAN PRICE, RUDY, STADTLER, TEJERA, WARDEN OF CANAAN USP, WARDEN OF OKLAHOMA CITY FTC, WAUGHEN, M. WOLEVER ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616101196) filed by JESSE RUSSELL SIMPSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(zjf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIMPSON v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAPLAIN OF CANAAN USP
Represented By: Joshua L. Rogers
Represented By: William J. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IAN CONNORS
Represented By: Joshua L. Rogers
Represented By: William J. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. GOMEZ
Represented By: Joshua L. Rogers
Represented By: William J. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUDY
Represented By: Joshua L. Rogers
Represented By: William J. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARDEN OF OKLAHOMA CITY FTC
Represented By: Joshua L. Rogers
Represented By: William J. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBOP GENERAL COUNSEL
Represented By: Joshua L. Rogers
Represented By: William J. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V MOSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FULLEN
Represented By: Joshua L. Rogers
Represented By: William J. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAUGHEN
Represented By: Joshua L. Rogers
Represented By: William J. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LESH
Represented By: Joshua L. Rogers
Represented By: William J. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DULLA
Represented By: Joshua L. Rogers
Represented By: William J. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN PRICE
Represented By: Joshua L. Rogers
Represented By: William J. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAEKASZI
Represented By: Joshua L. Rogers
Represented By: William J. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. DODRILL
Represented By: Joshua L. Rogers
Represented By: William J. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEJERA
Represented By: Joshua L. Rogers
Represented By: William J. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAPLAIN(S) OF OKLAHOMA CITY FTC
Represented By: Joshua L. Rogers
Represented By: William J. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.J. HARMON
Represented By: Joshua L. Rogers
Represented By: William J. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. PLAVI
Represented By: Joshua L. Rogers
Represented By: William J. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STADTLER
Represented By: Joshua L. Rogers
Represented By: William J. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIALONE
Represented By: Joshua L. Rogers
Represented By: William J. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. WOLEVER
Represented By: Joshua L. Rogers
Represented By: William J. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON
Represented By: Joshua L. Rogers
Represented By: William J. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARDEN OF CANAAN USP
Represented By: Joshua L. Rogers
Represented By: William J. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. MOSER
Represented By: Joshua L. Rogers
Represented By: William J. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSE RUSSELL SIMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?