BAILEY v. BISHOP et al
Defendant: MARYLAND ATTORNEY GEN, NBCI WARDEN FRANK BISHOP, MARYLAND ATTORNEY GENERAL and FRANK BISHOP
Petitioner: THOMAS LEE BAILEY
Case Number: 1:2019cv03178
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- THOMAS LEE BAILEY; Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to File DENIED" case transferred on 10/31/2019. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/26/2019. (zmd)
November 26, 2019 Receipt on 11/26/2019 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 8:19-cv-03409 sent by District of Maryland. (zrdj)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred to the USDC for the District of Maryland, pursuant to the Court Order entered 10/31/2019. Sent to Court via Electronically. (zsb)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the District of Maryland. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 11/20/2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/31/19. (zmd)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by THOMAS LEE BAILEY (adh, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by THOMAS LEE BAILEY (adh, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by THOMAS LEE BAILEY. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(adh, )
October 15, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 10/15/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAILEY v. BISHOP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: THOMAS LEE BAILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARYLAND ATTORNEY GEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBCI WARDEN FRANK BISHOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARYLAND ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK BISHOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?