SANCHEZ v. TARGET CORPORATION
Plaintiff: SANDRA SANCHEZ
Defendant: TARGET CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv03186
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Stipulated Protective ORDER. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/05/2019. (lcapm3)
December 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joinder of Parties and Amendments of Pleadings due by 3/3/2020. Proponent Rule 26(a)(2) due by 3/3/2020. Rebuttal Rule 26(a)(2) due by 4/20/2020. Joint Status Report due by 4/13/2020. Discovery shall conclude 5/13/2020. Post-Discovery Conference set for 5/15/2020 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting the following schedule for further proceedings in this matter: The parties shall serve any interrogatories or document requests by February 17, 2020; the deadline for joinder of parties and amendments of pleadings is March 3, 2020; Proponent expert reports and disclosures, consistent with Rule 26(a)(2), shall be made no later than March 3, 2020; the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report regarding the status of discovery on or before April 13, 2020; Rebuttal expert reports and disclosures, consistent with Rule 26(a)(2), shall be made no later than April 20, 2020; discovery shall conclude on May 13, 2020; and a Post-Discovery Status Conference is set for May 15, 2020, at 10:45 a.m. in Courtroom 10. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/04/2019. (lcapm3)
December 4, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 12/4/2019. Post-Discovery Conference set for 5/15/2020 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Huber, Jonathan)
October 30, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/4/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting Initial Scheduling Conference for December 4, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/30/2019. (lcapm3)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zmc)
October 30, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zmc)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 ERRATA Sheet to Correct Notice of Removal Caption by TARGET CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Amended Civil Cover Sheet)(Huber, Jonathan)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TARGET CORPORATION re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests, #2 Answer to Complaint . (Huber, Jonathan)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by TARGET CORPORATION (Huber, Jonathan)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by TARGET CORPORATION.(Huber, Jonathan)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2019CA006452B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADCDC-6475687 filed by TARGET CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint, Initial Order and Addendum, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Huber, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SANCHEZ v. TARGET CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA SANCHEZ
Represented By: Stuart Lewis Peacock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARGET CORPORATION
Represented By: Jonathan James Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?