PURKEY v. BARR et al
Plaintiff: WESLEY IRA PURKEY
Defendant: JOHN DOES I-X, KATHLEEN HAWK SAWYER, T.J. WATSON, JOSEPH MCCLAIN, RADM CHRIS A. BINA, JEFFREY E. KRUEGER, WILLIAM P. BARR and WILLIAM E. WILSON, M.D.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03214
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Death Penalty (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Cases Consolidated. Consolidating action with IN THE MATTER OF THE FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS' EXECUTION PROTOCOL CASES, 19-mc-0145 (TSC). All filings shall be made solely in the Master Case. Compliance with this directive requires that you select "No" when asked "Do you want to spread this docket entry?" (ztd)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Consolidating action with IN THE MATTER OF THE FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS' EXECUTION PROTOCOL CASES, 19-mc-0145 (TSC). All filings shall be made solely in the Master Case. Compliance with this directive requires that you select "No" when asked "Do you want to spread this docket entry?" All counsel of record shall familiarize themselves with the directives found in the court's August 20, 2019 Order (19mc145-TSC), a copy of which is attached. Consistent with the August 15, 2019 Minute Entry (19mc145-TSC), the parties shall adhere to the following schedule: Plaintiffs shall complete the necessary 30(b)(6) depositions on or before February 28, 2020; and Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint on or before March 31, 2020. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on November 8, 2019. (Attachments: #1 1) (tsclc2)
November 8, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/31/2020. Copy of PI motion due by 11/12/2019. Response due by 11/12/2019. Reply due by 11/18/2019. (tb)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #12 Joint Motion for Briefing Schedule and to Submit Supplemental Material. The Plaintiff's request for leave to file the supplemental affidavit is denied given that the evidence is already filed in the Master Case docket 19-mc-0145, into which this case has been consolidated. The proposed Briefing Schedule is denied. Plaintiff shall file a copy of his Motion for a Preliminary Injunction #6 on the Master Case docket 19-mc-0145 (TSC), by November 12, 2019 at 12 p.m.. Defendant shall file a response to the Motion for a Preliminary Injunction no later than November 12, 2019 at 5 p.m. Plaintiff shall file a reply no later than November 18, 2019 at 12 p.m.. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/8/2019. (tsclc2)
November 8, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re Staff Note: Counsel is instructed to disregard this entry, entered in wrong case. (tb)
November 7, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule and to Submit Supplemental Material, by WESLEY IRA PURKEY (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Arin Smith, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Arin)
November 7, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Request for Status Conference by WESLEY IRA PURKEY (Smith, Arin) Modified on 11/7/2019 (ztd).
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/4/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/3/2020. (Smith, Arin)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/4/2019. (Smith, Arin)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. WILLIAM P. BARR served on 11/4/2019; RADM CHRIS A. BINA served on 11/4/2019; JEFFREY E. KRUEGER served on 11/4/2019; JOSEPH MCCLAIN served on 11/4/2019; KATHLEEN HAWK SAWYER served on 11/4/2019; T.J. WATSON served on 11/4/2019; WILLIAM E. WILSON, M.D. served on 11/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - Bina, #2 Affidavit - Krueger, #3 Affidavit - McClain, #4 Affidavit - Sawyer, #5 Affidavit - Watson, #6 Affidavit - Wilson)(Smith, Arin)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Hearing and Statement of Facts Making Expedition Essential by WESLEY IRA PURKEY (Smith, Arin)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by WESLEY IRA PURKEY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Arin)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to WILLIAM P. BARR, RADM CHRIS A. BINA, JEFFREY E. KRUEGER, JOSEPH MCCLAIN, KATHLEEN HAWK SAWYER, T.J. WATSON, WILLIAM E. WILSON, M.D.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
October 29, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly is no longer assigned to the case. (zmc)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Ryan M. Chabot, :Firm- Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, :Address- 7 World Trade Center, 250 Greenwich Street New York, NY 10007. Phone No. - (212) 295-6513. Fax No. - (212) 230-8888 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6484345. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WESLEY IRA PURKEY (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Arin)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Alan E. Schoenfeld, :Firm- Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, :Address- 7 World Trade Center, 250 Greenwich Street New York, NY 10007. Phone No. - (212) 937-7294. Fax No. - (212) 230-8888 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6484067. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WESLEY IRA PURKEY (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Arin)
October 28, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zmc)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by WESLEY IRA PURKEY. Case related to Case No. 19-mc-145. (Smith, Arin)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WILLIAM P. BARR, RADM CHRIS A. BINA, JOHN DOES I-X, JEFFREY E. KRUEGER, JOSEPH MCCLAIN, KATHLEEN HAWK SAWYER, T.J. WATSON, WILLIAM E. WILSON, M.D. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6479829) filed by WESLEY IRA PURKEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons - Barr, #7 Summons - Bina, #8 Summons - Krueger, #9 Summons - McClain, #10 Summons - Sawyer, #11 Summons - Watson, #12 Summons - Wilson)(Smith, Arin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PURKEY v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHLEEN HAWK SAWYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.J. WATSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH MCCLAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RADM CHRIS A. BINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY E. KRUEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM P. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM E. WILSON, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESLEY IRA PURKEY
Represented By: Arin Hillary Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?