KUPPERMAN v. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE U.S.A. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Charles M. Kupperman, the former Deputy National Security Advisor and Acting National Security Advisor to President Donald J. Trump, is seeking a declaratory judgment on his obligation to comply with a House of Representative's subpoena issued pursuant to their impeachment inquiry. Plaintiff wants to know if he is immune from Congressional process when President Trump has instructed him not to appear and testify since he was a close personal advisor to the President.

Plaintiff: CHARLES M KUPPERMAN and CHARLES M. KUPPERMAN
Defendant: HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE U.S.A., CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF, ELIOT ENGEL, DONALD J. TRUMP and UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Petitioner: CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC., NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY, DOW JONES & COMPANY, INC., REUTERS NEWS & MEDIA INC., WP CO., LLC, NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA, LLC., CBS BROADCASTING INC., POLITICO LLC, JOHN MICHAEL MULVANEY and ASSOCIATED PRESS
Case Number: 1:2019cv03224
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Richard J Leon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 61 RESPONSE re #60 Notice (Other) filed by CHARLES M. KUPPERMAN. (Cooper, Charles)
December 11, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE by ELIOT ENGEL, CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Letter, Douglas)
December 11, 2019 Filing 59 TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION HEARING PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon held on December 10, 2019; Page Numbers: 1-68. Date of Issuance: December 11, 2019. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from t he court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 1/1/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/11/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2020.(wz)
December 10, 2019 Minute Entry for Proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Motions Hearing held on 12/10/2019 re: #40 #41 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. The #40 #41 Motions were Heard and Taken Under Advisement. (Court Reporter: William P. Zaremba) (jth)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. At tomorrow's hearing, the Court will hear argument on issues of justiciability. Specifically, the Court directs the parties to focus on mootness and standing. Each of the three parties will have twenty minutes to argue, and defendants may each reserve up to five minutes of their twenty for rebuttal. In light of the parties' extensive and thoughtful briefing, the Court will not require the parties to address the merits tomorrow. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/9/2019. (lcrjl2)
December 5, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Elisabeth S. Theodore on behalf of ELIOT ENGEL, CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Theodore, Elisabeth)
December 5, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE by DONALD J. TRUMP re #56 Reply to opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Reply)(Handley, Cristen)
December 4, 2019 Filing 56 REPLY to opposition to motion re #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment (Reply in Support of Defendant President Donald J. Trump's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment) filed by DONALD J. TRUMP. (Gilligan, James)
December 4, 2019 Filing 55 Memorandum in opposition to re #43 MOTION to Modify ADD THE HONORABLE PAUL D. IRVING AS CO-DEFENDANT filed by ELIOT ENGEL, CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (Letter, Douglas)
December 4, 2019 Filing 54 REPLY to opposition to motion re #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss filed by ELIOT ENGEL, CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (Letter, Douglas)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of #50 Defendant Donald J. Trump's Consent Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/4/2019. (lcrjl2)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of #44 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to File a Consolidated Response Brief and to Enlarge the Page Limit, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/4/2019. (lcrjl2)
December 4, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Sally Pei on behalf of ELIOT ENGEL, CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Pei, Sally)
December 4, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Stanton Jones on behalf of ELIOT ENGEL, CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Jones, Robert)
December 4, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel F. Jacobson on behalf of ELIOT ENGEL, CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Jacobson, Daniel)
December 3, 2019 Filing 50 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Handley, Cristen)
November 28, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Intent to Respond by ELIOT ENGEL, CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Letter, Douglas)
November 27, 2019 Filing 48 RESPONSE re #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss (Defendant President Donald J. Trump's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Response to the House Defendants' Motion to Dismiss) filed by DONALD J. TRUMP. (Gilligan, James)
November 27, 2019 Filing 47 RESPONSE re #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ELIOT ENGEL, CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts)(Letter, Douglas)
November 27, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose Joel Alicea on behalf of CHARLES M. KUPPERMAN (Alicea, Jose)
November 27, 2019 Filing 45 Memorandum in opposition to re #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss , #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CHARLES M. KUPPERMAN. (Cooper, Charles)
November 27, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by CHARLES M. KUPPERMAN (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
November 27, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION to Modify ADD THE HONORABLE PAUL D. IRVING AS CO-DEFENDANT by CHARLES M. KUPPERMAN (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of President Trump and the House Defendants' joint #42 Motion for Clarification or, in the Alternative, Modification (Without Extension) of the Briefing Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that the briefing schedule set by the Court's #19 November 4, 2019 Order remains in effect. All arguments in opposition to a position taken in any November 14, 2019 dispositive motion, including any arguments President Trump or the House Defendants intend to raise in opposition to the other's position on the merits, shall be raised in opposition briefs filed on or before November 27, 2019. President Trump and the House Defendants may file reply briefs in support of their dispositive motions on or before December 4, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/18/2019. (lcrjl2)
November 18, 2019 Filing 42 Joint MOTION to Clarify or, in the alternative, Joint MOTION to Modify (Without Extension) the Briefing Schedule by DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bernie, Andrew)
November 14, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss by ELIOT ENGEL, CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas)
November 14, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for Summary Judgment by DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Declaration of Matthias Mitman, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bernie, Andrew)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of #39 Notice by John Michael Mulvaney, the status conference scheduled for this afternoon (November 12, 2019) is no longer necessary and is hereby VACATED. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall proceed on the briefing schedule set by #19 the Court's November 4, 2019 Order. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/12/2019. (lcrjl3)
November 12, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE by JOHN MICHAEL MULVANEY (Pittard, William)
November 11, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference scheduled for 11/12/2019, at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (tg)
November 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Telephone Conference held on 11/11/2019. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba.) (tg)
November 11, 2019 Filing 38 TRANSCRIPT OF TELEPHONE MOTION HEARING PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon held on November 11, 2019; Page Numbers: 1-30. Date of Issuance: November 11, 2019. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purcha sed from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/2/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/12/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/9/2020.(wz)
November 11, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of John Michael Mulvaney's #37 Notice of Withdrawal of his Motion to Intervene, which states his intention to file his complaint as a related case, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties to this case and to Mr. Mulvaney's proposed related case shall appear for a status conference on November 12, 2019, at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon to address opposition, if any, to the related case status and to address any minor adjustments to the briefing schedule that the Court will make should the Court determine that the cases are related. However, as I indicated during the conference call today, under no circumstances will the December 10, 2019 oral argument date be delayed. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/11/2019. (lcrjl2)
November 11, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by JOHN MICHAEL MULVANEY re #26 MOTION to Intervene (Pittard, William)
November 11, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Media Coalition's #32 and CBS News and NBC's emergency #35 Motions to Intervene and for Access to Hearing, it is hereby ORDERED that the motions are DENIED. The telephonic conference to which movants seek access is not under seal. Because of the time-sensitive nature of the motion that is in dispute, the conference call is being held on a federal holiday, and the courthouse is closed. The Court cannot accommodate movants' request for live access to the telephonic conference. But the Court expects a transcript of the proceeding to become available shortly after it ends, and movants may obtain a copy. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/11/2019. (lcrjl2)
November 11, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Barbero on behalf of ELIOT ENGEL, HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE U.S.A., CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF (Barbero, Megan)
November 11, 2019 Filing 35 Emergency MOTION to Intervene and Join Motion for Access by CBS Broadcasting Inc., NBCUniversal Media, LLC. (Kelley, Matthew)
November 11, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew E. Kelley on behalf of CBS Broadcasting Inc., NBCUniversal Media, LLC. (Kelley, Matthew)
November 11, 2019 Filing 33 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ASSOCIATED PRESS, CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC., DOW JONES & COMPANY, INC., NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY, POLITICO LLC, Reuters News & Media Inc., WP CO., LLC (Kelley, Matthew)
November 11, 2019 Filing 32 Emergency MOTION to Intervene and for Access to Hearing by ASSOCIATED PRESS, CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC., DOW JONES & COMPANY, INC., NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY, POLITICO LLC, Reuters News & Media Inc., WP CO., LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelley, Matthew)
November 11, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew E. Kelley on behalf of CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC., ASSOCIATED PRESS, DOW JONES & COMPANY, INC., NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY, POLITICO LLC, Reuters News & Media Inc., WP CO., LLC (Kelley, Matthew)
November 11, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE re #26 MOTION to Intervene filed by CHARLES M KUPPERMAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
November 11, 2019 Filing 29 Memorandum in opposition to re #26 MOTION to Intervene filed by ELIOT ENGEL, HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE U.S.A., CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF. (Letter, Douglas)
November 10, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Anderson Grogg on behalf of ELIOT ENGEL, HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE U.S.A., CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF (Grogg, Adam)
November 9, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that a telephonic conference regarding the #26 Motion to Intervene filed by John Michael Mulvaney is set for Monday, November 11, 2019, at 5:00 PM before Judge Richard J. Leon. Counsel for all parties to this suit and counsel for the proposed intervenor shall call chambers together, and the Court will hear oral argument on the Motion at that time. To the extent any party wishes to additionally respond in writing to the Motion to Intervene, the written response must be filed with the Court no later than 2:00 PM on Monday, November 11, 2019, and it must not exceed 10 pages. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/9/2019. (lcrjl2)
November 8, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher C. Muha on behalf of JOHN MICHAEL MULVANEY (Muha, Christopher)
November 8, 2019 Filing 26 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED 11/11/2019.....MOTION to Intervene by JOHN MICHAEL MULVANEY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (House Email and Subpoena), #2 Exhibit 2 (White House Counsel Letter and OLC Opinion), #3 Exhibit 3 (Proposed Complaint), #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Pittard, William) Modified on 11/12/2019 (znmw).
November 8, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by William Bullock Pittard, IV on behalf of JOHN MICHAEL MULVANEY (Pittard, William)
November 8, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE by CHARLES M KUPPERMAN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cooper, Charles)
November 6, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Telephone Conference held on 11/6/2019. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba.) (tg) Modified to correct date of conference on 11/8/2019 (tg).
November 6, 2019 Filing 23 TRANSCRIPT OF TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon held on November 6, 2019; Page Numbers: 1-10. Date of Issuance: November 6, 2019. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purch ased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/27/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/4/2020.(wz)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that a telephonic conference is set for today, November 6, 2019, at 5:00 PM before Judge Richard J. Leon. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/6/2019. (lcrjl2)
November 6, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Vacate #19 Order,,,,, by ELIOT ENGEL, HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE U.S.A., CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas)
November 6, 2019 Filing 21 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DONALD J. TRUMP served on 11/6/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/04/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Cooper, Charles)
November 4, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by CHARLES M KUPPERMAN (Cooper, Charles)
November 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' dispositive motions due by 11/14/2019; opposition briefs by all parties due by 11/27/2019; defendants' reply briefs due by 12/4/2019. (tg)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. Upon further review of the #15 transcript of the October 31, 2019 status conference in this matter, and upon consideration of plaintiff's #18 November 4, 2019 letter to the Court, it is hereby ORDERED that the briefing schedule in this case is amended and clarified as follows. On or before November 14, 2019, defendants shall file any dispositive motions they intend to bring in this case. In support of their motions, defendants should raise all arguments--including both arguments relating to the justiciability of plaintiff's claims and arguments relating to the merits of plaintiff's claims--that, they contend, provide a basis for resolving plaintiff's claims as a matter of law. On or before November 27, 2019, all parties shall file any briefs in opposition, whether relating to justiciability or the merits. On or before December 4, 2019, defendants may file reply briefs in support of the grounds for resolving plaintiff's claims that were raised in their opening briefs. At the December 10, 2019 hearing, the parties should be prepared to address all dispositive issues--whether relating to justiciability or the merits--on which they have a position. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/4/2019. (lcrjl2)
November 4, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #18 Notice (Other) was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading in proper format. (Counsel should review LCvR 5.1 (a) CORRESPONDENCE WITH THE COURT. (jf)
November 4, 2019 Filing 18 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE Letter Correspondence to Court by CHARLES M KUPPERMAN (Cooper, Charles) Modified on 11/4/2019 (jf).
November 1, 2019 Filing 17 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ELIOT ENGEL served on 10/29/2019; HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE U.S.A. served on 10/29/2019; CAROLYN B. MALONEY served on 10/29/2019; NANCY PELOSI served on 10/29/2019; ADAM SCHIFF served on 10/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit)(Cooper, Charles) Modified on 11/4/2019 to correct service date (zeg).
November 1, 2019 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/28/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/27/2019. (Cooper, Charles) Modified on 11/4/2019 to correct serve/answer due date (jf).
November 1, 2019 Filing 15 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon held on October 31, 2019; Page Numbers: 1-32. Date of Issuance: November 1, 2019. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/22/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/2/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2020.(wz)
October 31, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Status Conference held on 10/31/2019. Defendants' Briefs are due by 11/14/2019; Plaintiff's Response is due by 11/27/2019; Replies are due by 12/4/2019; Oral Argument is set for 12/10/2019 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter: William P. Zaremba) (jth)
October 31, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Serena Maya Schulz Orloff on behalf of DONALD J. TRUMP (Orloff, Serena)
October 31, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Barry Tatelman on behalf of ELIOT ENGEL, HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE U.S.A., CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF (Tatelman, Todd)
October 31, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Josephine T. Morse on behalf of ELIOT ENGEL, HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE U.S.A., CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF (Morse, Josephine)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of defendants' #10 Motion to Reschedule Status Conference, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Because the principal purpose of the October 31 status conference is simply to set a briefing schedule, and because each moving party has multiple counsel listed in the signature block on the motion, the conflict identified by defendants is not a sufficient reason to change the date of the status conference. The Court will, however, reschedule the status conference to 4:00 PM on October 31, 2019, to increase the likelihood that all counsel will be able to attend. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/30/2019. (lcrjl2)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth J. Shapiro on behalf of DONALD J. TRUMP (Shapiro, Elizabeth)
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Status Conference by DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Handley, Cristen)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas N. Letter on behalf of ELIOT ENGEL, HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE U.S.A., CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF (Letter, Douglas)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Cristen Cori Handley on behalf of DONALD J. TRUMP (Handley, Cristen)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Marshall Bernie on behalf of DONALD J. TRUMP (Bernie, Andrew)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A. Myers on behalf of DONALD J. TRUMP (Myers, Steven)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James Mahoney Burnham on behalf of DONALD J. TRUMP (Burnham, James)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Due to the time-sensitive nature of the issues raised in this case, it is hereby ORDERED that a status conference is set for October 31, 2019, at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. It is further ORDERED that plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Minute Order on all defendants named in the complaint, and that counsel for each defendant shall enter an appearance as soon as possible in advance of the status conference. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/28/2019. (lcrjl2)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/28/2019. (lcrjl2)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to ELIOT ENGEL, HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE U.S.A., CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF, DONALD J. TRUMP, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
October 28, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (zmc)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Kirk on behalf of CHARLES M KUPPERMAN (Kirk, Michael)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6481004) filed by CHARLES M KUPPERMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(Cooper, Charles)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6481004) filed by CHARLES M KUPPERMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons)(Cooper, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KUPPERMAN v. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE U.S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES M KUPPERMAN
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES M. KUPPERMAN
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE U.S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROLYN B. MALONEY
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Todd Barry Tatelman
Represented By: Douglas N. Letter
Represented By: Josephine T. Morse
Represented By: Robert Stanton Jones
Represented By: Adam Anderson Grogg
Represented By: Sally Pei
Represented By: Megan Barbero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY PELOSI
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Todd Barry Tatelman
Represented By: Douglas N. Letter
Represented By: Josephine T. Morse
Represented By: Robert Stanton Jones
Represented By: Adam Anderson Grogg
Represented By: Sally Pei
Represented By: Megan Barbero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAM SCHIFF
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Todd Barry Tatelman
Represented By: Douglas N. Letter
Represented By: Josephine T. Morse
Represented By: Robert Stanton Jones
Represented By: Adam Anderson Grogg
Represented By: Sally Pei
Represented By: Megan Barbero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIOT ENGEL
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Todd Barry Tatelman
Represented By: Douglas N. Letter
Represented By: Josephine T. Morse
Represented By: Robert Stanton Jones
Represented By: Adam Anderson Grogg
Represented By: Sally Pei
Represented By: Megan Barbero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP
Represented By: Andrew Marshall Bernie
Represented By: James J. Gilligan
Represented By: Cristen Cori Handley
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Shapiro
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Represented By: James Mahoney Burnham
Represented By: Serena Maya Schulz Orloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Theodore
Represented By: Todd Barry Tatelman
Represented By: Douglas N. Letter
Represented By: Josephine T. Morse
Represented By: Robert Stanton Jones
Represented By: Adam Anderson Grogg
Represented By: Sally Pei
Represented By: Megan Barbero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC.
Represented By: Matthew E. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY
Represented By: Matthew E. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DOW JONES & COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Matthew E. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: REUTERS NEWS & MEDIA INC.
Represented By: Matthew E. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WP CO., LLC
Represented By: Matthew E. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA, LLC.
Represented By: Matthew E. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CBS BROADCASTING INC.
Represented By: Matthew E. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: POLITICO LLC
Represented By: Matthew E. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOHN MICHAEL MULVANEY
Represented By: Christopher C. Muha
Represented By: William Bullock Pittard, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ASSOCIATED PRESS
Represented By: Matthew E. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?