HOLY NAME MEDICAL CENTER, INC. et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: INSPIRA MEDICAL CENTERS, INC., MUHLENBERG REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., HOLY NAME MEDICAL CENTER, INC., HMH HOSPITALS CORPORATION, PROSPECT EAST ORANGE GENERAL HOSPITAL, ATLANTICARE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., ST. BARNABAS HOSPITAL, EPISCOPAL HEALTH SERVICES, INC., KENNEDY UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC., ENGLEWOOD HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER, INC., SOUTH JERSEY HOSPITAL, INSPIRA MEDICAL CENTERS, INC. doing business as SOUTH JERSEY HEALTHCARE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER doing business as INSPIRA MEDICAL CENTER VINELAND also known as SOUTH JERSEY HOSPITAL, PROSPECT EAST ORANGE GENERAL HOSPITAL doing business as EAST ORANGE GENERAL HOSPITAL, ENGLEWOOD HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as ENGLEWOOD HOSPITAL, MUHLENBERG REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as MUHLENBERG REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, HOLY NAME MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as HOLY NAME HOSPITAL, EPISCOPAL HEALTH SERVICES, INC. doing business as ST. JOHN'S EPISCOPAL HOSPITAL SOUTH, KENNEDY UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC. doing business as JEFFERSON CHERRY HILL HOSPITAL doing business as KENNEDY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL doing business as JEFFERSON STRATFORD HOSPITAL, HMH HOSPITALS CORPORATION doing business as JERSEY SHORE UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, ST. BARNABAS HOSPITAL doing business as SBH HEALTH SYSTEM and HMH HOSPITALS CORPORATION doing business as RARITAN BAY MEDICAL CENTER
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv03230
Filed: October 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court has reviewed the notices of related case filed by the defendant in Capital Health System, Inc. v. Azar, 19-cv-03229-TJK and in Holy Name Medical Center, Inc. v. Azar, 19-cv-03230-RC, the stated grounds for plaintiffs' objections to the notices and consolidation, and the pleadings in both cases, and it is persuaded that the cases fall squarely within the order of consolidation entered on November 4, 2019. Therefore, the Clerk of Court is directed to transfer Capital Health System, Inc. v. Azar, 19-cv-03229-TJK and Holy Name Medical Center, Inc. v. Azar, 19-cv-03230-RC to this Court with the consent of the judges currently assigned. The Clerk of Court is further direct to consolidate these cases into In re Allina II-Type DSH Adjustment Cases, 19-mc-190. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/13/19. (DMK)
December 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ALEX M. AZAR, II. Case related to Case No. 19-mc-00190. (Bryce, Peter)
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Bryce on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (Bryce, Peter)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
October 29, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb)
October 27, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ATLANTICARE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., ENGLEWOOD HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER, INC., EPISCOPAL HEALTH SERVICES, INC., HMH HOSPITALS CORPORATION, HOLY NAME MEDICAL CENTER, INC., INSPIRA MEDICAL CENTERS, INC., KENNEDY UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC., MUHLENBERG REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., PROSPECT EAST ORANGE GENERAL HOSPITAL, ST. BARNABAS HOSPITAL (Glazer, Joseph)
October 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6481340) filed by ATLANTICARE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., INSPIRA MEDICAL CENTERS, INC., HMH HOSPITALS CORPORATION, MUHLENBERG REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., ST. BARNABAS HOSPITAL, PROSPECT EAST ORANGE GENERAL HOSPITAL, ENGLEWOOD HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER, INC., HOLY NAME MEDICAL CENTER, INC., EPISCOPAL HEALTH SERVICES, INC., KENNEDY UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit August 30, 2019 EJR, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Azar, #4 Summons Attorney General, #5 Summons US Attorney)(Glazer, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOLY NAME MEDICAL CENTER, INC. et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INSPIRA MEDICAL CENTERS, INC.
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MUHLENBERG REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOLY NAME MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HMH HOSPITALS CORPORATION
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROSPECT EAST ORANGE GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATLANTICARE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. BARNABAS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EPISCOPAL HEALTH SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNEDY UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC.
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENGLEWOOD HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUTH JERSEY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INSPIRA MEDICAL CENTERS, INC. doing business as SOUTH JERSEY HEALTHCARE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER doing business as INSPIRA MEDICAL CENTER VINELAND also known as SOUTH JERSEY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROSPECT EAST ORANGE GENERAL HOSPITAL doing business as EAST ORANGE GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENGLEWOOD HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as ENGLEWOOD HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MUHLENBERG REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as MUHLENBERG REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOLY NAME MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as HOLY NAME HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EPISCOPAL HEALTH SERVICES, INC. doing business as ST. JOHN'S EPISCOPAL HOSPITAL SOUTH
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNEDY UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS, INC. doing business as JEFFERSON CHERRY HILL HOSPITAL doing business as KENNEDY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL doing business as JEFFERSON STRATFORD HOSPITAL
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HMH HOSPITALS CORPORATION doing business as JERSEY SHORE UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. BARNABAS HOSPITAL doing business as SBH HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HMH HOSPITALS CORPORATION doing business as RARITAN BAY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Joseph David Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Peter M. Bryce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?