IN RE: ANTONIO CRAWFORD
Petitioner: ANTONIO CRAWFORD
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv03269
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 SHOW CAUSE Executed as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA pursuant to Order to Show Cause #1 ; Date of Service of show cause order 12/17/2019. (eg)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Ronald Cahill on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Cahill, Timothy)
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 SHOW CAUSE (1) Issued as to United States via United States Attorney for the District of Columbia, Special Proceedings Division pursuant to Order to Show Cause #2 . (zmd)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the government to show cause within 20 days from service of petition why the writ of habeas corpus should not issue; directing court officials to effectuate prompt service upon the United States (see document for details). Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/6/19.(ah)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the USCA/DC. Case Number 18-5237 filed by ANTONIO CRAWFORD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Habeas petition, #3 Exhibit motion to amend (1), #4 Exhibit motion to amend (2), #5 Exhibit motion to hold case in abeyance, #6 Exhibit petitioner's brief)(zrdj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: ANTONIO CRAWFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ANTONIO CRAWFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Timothy Ronald Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?