UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ONE MILLION ONE HUNDRED AND ONE THOUSAND FOUR HUNDRED FIFTY FOUR DOLLARS AND THIRTY ONE CENTS ($1,101,454.31) IN UNITED STATES FUNDS
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: ONE MILLION ONE HUNDRED AND ONE THOUSAND FOUR HUNDRED FIFTY FOUR DOLLARS AND THIRTY ONE CENTS ($1,101,454.31) IN UNITED STATES FUNDS
Case Number: 1:2019cv03276
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rosemary M Collyer
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Government's Status Report due by 1/15/2020. (kt)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: On the Court's own motion, it is hereby ORDERED that, by not later than January 15, 2020, the government shall file a status report indicating whether the warrant issued by the Clerk of Court on November 1, 2019 has been executed and whether the notice requirements of Rule G of the Supplemental Rules for Admiralty or Maritime Claims and Asset Forfeiture Actions have been satisfied; and it is further ORDERED that the government shall include in its status report a proposed schedule for further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 11/15/2019. (DAS)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Case related to: 11cr301 (RMC). (zmc) Modified event title on 11/18/2019 (znmw).
November 15, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. Judge Dabney L. Friedrich is no longer assigned to the case. (zmc)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 WARRANT (1) for Arrest In Rem Issued Electronically (zmc) (Main Document 2 replaced to include court seal on 11/15/2019) (zmc).
November 1, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zmc)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ONE MILLION ONE HUNDRED AND ONE THOUSAND FOUR HUNDRED FIFTY FOUR DOLLARS AND THIRTY ONE CENTS ($1,101,454.31) IN UNITED STATES FUNDS (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Warrant for Arrest in Rem, #3 Related Case Form)(Lal, Arvind)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ONE MILLION ONE HUNDRED AND ONE THOUSAND FOUR HUNDRED FIFTY FOUR DOLLARS AND THIRTY ONE CENTS ($1,101,454.31) IN UNITED STATES FUNDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONE MILLION ONE HUNDRED AND ONE THOUSAND FOUR HUNDRED FIFTY FOUR DOLLARS AND THIRTY ONE CENTS ($1,101,454.31) IN UNITED STATES FUNDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Arvind K. Lal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?