SOLOMON SYSTEMS, INC. v. THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
Plaintiff: SOLOMON SYSTEMS, INC.
Defendant: THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, MURIEL BOWSER, CHESAPEAKE REGIONAL INFORMATION SERVICE FOR OUR PATIENTS, DC, WAYNE TURNAGE and DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Case Number: 1:2019cv03299
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #5 Pro Se Order Directing Prisoner Statement, was entered in error and the Clerk's Office Deputy Clerk will docket Order in 19-cv-3289 (UNA). (zmd)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENTERED IN ERROR.....PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/8/19. (zmd) Modified on 11/14/2019 (zmd).
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jonathan Dyste Link (Link, Jonathan)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to MURIEL BOWSER, CHESAPEAKE REGIONAL INFORMATION SERVICE FOR OUR PATIENTS, DC, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, WAYNE TURNAGE. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
November 7, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zmc)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 ERRATA by SOLOMON SYSTEMS, INC. #1 Complaint, filed by SOLOMON SYSTEMS, INC.. (Link, Jonathan)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6498252) filed by SOLOMON SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Link, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOLOMON SYSTEMS, INC. v. THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MURIEL BOWSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHESAPEAKE REGIONAL INFORMATION SERVICE FOR OUR PATIENTS, DC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAYNE TURNAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOLOMON SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Dyste Link
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?