DRIESSEN v. BEST BUY COMPANY, INCORPORATED
Plaintiff: JAMES L. DRIESSEN
Defendant: BEST BUY COMPANY, INCORPORATED
Case Number: 1:2019cv03301
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re Create Case Association, was entered in error and will be refiled in 19cv3360.(jf)
December 9, 2019 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Cases associated. Case 19-3239 and 19-3301 have been consolidated pursuant to Minute Order filed on 12/02/2019. From this date forward, all pleadings shall be filed ONLY in the lead/earlier case, Civil Action No. 19-3239. (jf) Modified on 12/9/2019 (jf).
November 7, 2019 Cases associated. Pursuant to Minute Order filed on 11/07/2019 the Court sua sponte consolidates this action with Civil Action No. 19-3239. Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a) (permitting the court to consolidate actions "involv[ing] a common question of law or fact"); Local Civ. R. 40.5(a)(3)(defining related civil actions). All future filings in this case shall be made in Civil Action No. 19-3239. (jf)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a)(2), the Court sua sponte consolidates this action with Civil Action No. 19-3239. Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a) (permitting the court to consolidate actions "involv[ing] a common question of law or fact"); Local Civ. R. 40.5(a)(3)(defining related civil actions). All future filings in this case shall be made in Civil Action No. 19-3239. This order is without prejudice and subject to a motion for consideration by the parties. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/7/2019. (lcegs2)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 Case directly reassigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan as related. Judge James E. Boasberg is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by JAMES L. DRIESSEN. Case related to Case No. 19cv3239. (ztth)
November 1, 2019 Summons (1) Issued as to BEST BUY COMPANY, INCORPORATED. (ztth)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BEST BUY COMPANY, INCORPORATED (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616101318) with Jury Demand filed by JAMES L. DRIESSEN. (Attachments: #1 ExhibitS, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ztth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DRIESSEN v. BEST BUY COMPANY, INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEST BUY COMPANY, INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES L. DRIESSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?