CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON et al v. POMPEO et al
Plaintiff: NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE, SOCIETY FOR HISTORIANS OF AMERICAN FOREIGN RELATIONS and CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE and Michael R. Pompeo
Case Number: 1:2019cv03324
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MICHAEL R. POMPEO served on 12/16/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 11/25/2019 (Weismann, Anne)
November 13, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #7 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant,,, Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General,,, Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney,, was entered in error and refiled said pleading as docket entry #8 . (ztd)
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MICHAEL R. POMPEO served on 11/13/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 11/13/2019. (See Docket Entry #8 to view document_ (jf)
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/13/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/13/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/12/2020.) (Weismann, Anne)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MICHAEL R. POMPEO served on 11/13/2019; SOCIETY FOR HISTORIANS OF AMERICAN FOREIGN RELATIONS served on 11/13/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 11/13/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/13/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/13/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/12/2020.) (Weismann, Anne) Modified on 11/13/2019 (ztd).
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by George M. Clarke, III on behalf of CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON, NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE, SOCIETY FOR HISTORIANS OF AMERICAN FOREIGN RELATIONS (Clarke, George)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mireille R. Oldak on behalf of CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON, NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE, SOCIETY FOR HISTORIANS OF AMERICAN FOREIGN RELATIONS (Oldak, Mireille)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (4) Reissued Electronically as to MICHAEL R. POMPEO, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
November 6, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly is no longer assigned to the case. (zmc)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to MICHAEL R. POMPEO, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) Modified on 11/6/2019 (zmc).
November 6, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zmc)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON, NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE, SOCIETY FOR HISTORIANS OF AMERICAN FOREIGN RELATIONS. Case related to Case No. 19-1333. (Weismann, Anne)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MICHAEL R. POMPE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6507070) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON, SOCIETY FOR HISTORIANS OF AMERICAN FOREIGN RELATIONS, NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney, #3 Summons Secretary of State Pompeo, #4 Summons U.S. Department of State, #5 Summons Attorney General)(Weismann, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON et al v. POMPEO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R. Pompeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE
Represented By: Anne L. Weismann
Represented By: George M. Clarke, III
Represented By: Mireille R. Oldak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOCIETY FOR HISTORIANS OF AMERICAN FOREIGN RELATIONS
Represented By: Anne L. Weismann
Represented By: George M. Clarke, III
Represented By: Mireille R. Oldak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Represented By: Anne L. Weismann
Represented By: George M. Clarke, III
Represented By: Mireille R. Oldak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?