EIMICKE v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Plaintiff: ROSLYN BLACK EIMICKE
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv03326
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING AND PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/9/19. (dot)
December 9, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 12/9/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 2/7/2020. Discovery due by 10/9/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 1/22/2020. Initial Disclosure due by 1/6/2020. Proponent's Rule 26(a)(2)(B)&(C) Disclosures due by 6/8/2020. Opponent's Rule 26(a)(2)(B)&(C) Disclosures due by 8/7/2020; Replies, if any, due by 8/21/2020. Status Conference set for 10/16/2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Lisa Edwards.) (dot)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Ezeigbo, Ifeanyi)
November 26, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/9/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: There is currently an Initial Scheduling Conference set for December 9, 2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 28A for this matter. See #6 Scheduling Order. Due to a scheduling conflict, and with the parties' consent, the Initial Scheduling Conference shall be rescheduled for December 9, 2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 28A. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 26, 2019. (lccck1)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/9/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/12/19. (dot)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION.(Ezeigbo, Ifeanyi)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/6/2019. (DM)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zmc)
November 6, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zmc)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (Ezeigbo, Ifeanyi)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of D.C., case number 2019 CA 006664 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADCDC-6507172 filed by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Superior Court Documents, #3 Superior Court Documents, #4 Superior Court Documents, #5 Superior Court Documents, #6 Superior Court Documents)(Ezeigbo, Ifeanyi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EIMICKE v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSLYN BLACK EIMICKE
Represented By: John J. Yannone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Represented By: Ifeanyi Olusegun Ezeigbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?