EVANS v. HOOD et al
Plaintiff: ANDIA EVANS
Defendant: DAVID HOOD, CAROLYN WILSON, JoANN HOOD and JOANN HOOD LIVING TRUST
Case Number: 1:2019cv03346
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 23:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JOANN HOOD served on 12/31/2019, answer due 1/21/2020 (Temple, Donald)
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JOANN HOOD LIVING TRUST served on 12/31/2019, answer due 1/21/2020 (Temple, Donald)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CAROLYN WILSON served on 12/21/2019, answer due 1/11/2020 (Temple, Donald)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to JOANN HOOD LIVING TRUST. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(eg)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by ANDIA EVANS (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons)(Temple, Donald) Modified on 12/18/2019 to correct event/docket text (eg).
December 10, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against DAVID HOOD, JOANN HOOD, CAROLYN WILSON, JOANN HOOD LIVING TRUST with Jury Demand filed by ANDIA EVANS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-7)(Temple, Donald)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DAVID HOOD, JOANN HOOD, CAROLYN WILSON. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
November 7, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zmc)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6511603) filed by ANDIA EVANS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Temple, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EVANS v. HOOD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDIA EVANS
Represented By: Donald M. Temple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID HOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROLYN WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JoANN HOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOANN HOOD LIVING TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?