FOOD & WATER WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE et al
Plaintiff: FOOD & WATER WATCH, INC.
Defendant: FOOD SAFETY AND INSPECTION SERVICE and U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
Case Number: 1:2019cv03362
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answers due by 1/7/2020 (lsj)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff's complaint by January 7, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/17/19. (lccrc1)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE served on 11/18/2019 (Corrigan, Zachary)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by FOOD SAFETY AND INSPECTION SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) Modified event on 12/17/2019 (ztd).
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/19/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/19/2019. (Corrigan, Zachary)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/18/19. (Corrigan, Zachary)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FOOD SAFETY AND INSPECTION SERVICE served on 11/20/2019 (Corrigan, Zachary)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FOOD SAFETY AND INSPECTION SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Main Document 3 replaced to correct missing signature on 11/12/2019) (zmc).
November 8, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmc)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests (and LCR 7.1 certificate) by FOOD & WATER WATCH, INC. (Corrigan, Zachary)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FOOD SAFETY AND INSPECTION SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6514693) filed by FOOD & WATER WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover sheet, #2 Summons Summons USDA, #3 Summons Summons FSIS, #4 Summons Summons USAG, #5 Summons Summons USAO)(Corrigan, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FOOD & WATER WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOOD SAFETY AND INSPECTION SERVICE
Represented By: Jeremy S. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
Represented By: Jeremy S. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FOOD & WATER WATCH, INC.
Represented By: Zachary B. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?