SIM DEVELOPMENT, LLC v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Plaintiff: SIM DEVELOPMENT, LLC
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Case Number: 1:2019cv03383
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 REPLY to opposition to motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (DeBerardinis, Robert)
November 29, 2019 Filing 4 Memorandum in opposition to re #3 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SIM DEVELOPMENT, LLC. (Crickman, Kenneth)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION for Summary Judgment by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(DeBerardinis, Robert). Added MOTION for Summary Judgment on 11/20/2019 (jf).
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to Counsel/Party (zrdj)
November 12, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zrdj)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2019 CA 006370 B (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Superior Court Documents)(Blecher, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIM DEVELOPMENT, LLC v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIM DEVELOPMENT, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth C. Crickman
Represented By: Robert Clayton Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Matthew Robert Blecher
Represented By: Robert A. DeBerardinis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?