PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. NATIONAL OCEANIC & ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION
Plaintiff: PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Defendant: NATIONAL OCEANIC & ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv03390
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Response to #1 Complaint due by 1/10/2020. (zjd)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the defendant's #5 Consent Motion to Extend Time to Answer Complaint. The defendant shall answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before January 10, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 13, 2019. (lcdlf1)
December 10, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by NATIONAL OCEANIC & ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of NATIONAL OCEANIC & ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION (Cirino, Paul)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL OCEANIC & ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
November 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zrdj)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (zrdj)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL OCEANIC & ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6529750) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet, #2 Summons AG summons, #3 Summons Agency Summons, #4 Summons USAO summons, #5 Declaration 26.1 statement)(Jenkins, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. NATIONAL OCEANIC & ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL OCEANIC & ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Represented By: Peter T. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?