OPELOUSAS GENERAL HOSPITAL v. AZAR
Plaintiff: OPELOUSAS GENERAL HOSPITAL
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv03393
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: John D Bates
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 11/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service 03)(Sedley, Alan)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/27/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service 02)(Sedley, Alan)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/26/19. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service 01)(Sedley, Alan)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
November 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zrdj)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests (Sedley, Alan)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6532030) filed by OPELOUSAS GENERAL HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Summons 01, #2 Summons 02, #3 Summons 03, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C)(Sedley, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OPELOUSAS GENERAL HOSPITAL v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OPELOUSAS GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Alan Jay Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?