CARDENAS v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
Plaintiff: JULIO CESAR CARDENAS
Defendant: JODY LEE, ANGEL CASTRO, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE and JODY LEE YOUNG
Case Number: 1:2019cv03408
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Civil Rights (Other)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Withdraw ; granting #5 Motion to Dismiss (See order for details). Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/17/2019. (zsb)
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Withdraw, MOTION to Dismiss by JULIO CESAR CARDENAS (zsb)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED 12/17/2019.....ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Southern District of Texas. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 12/23/2019. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/27/2019. (adh, ) Modified on 12/17/2019 (zsb).
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by JULIO CESAR CARDENAS (adh, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JULIO CESAR CARDENAS (adh, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ASSISTANT UNITED STATES, ASSISTANT UNITED STATES ATTORNEY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by JULIO CESAR CARDENAS.(adh, )
November 8, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 11/08/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARDENAS v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JODY LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGEL CASTRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JODY LEE YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIO CESAR CARDENAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?