FLEMING v. SAUL
Plaintiff: YOLANDA FLEMING
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv03420
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Referring Judge: Deborah A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/11/2019. RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/11/2019. (Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/9/2020.) (ztth)
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson for full case management, excluding resolution of dispositive motions, for which the Magistrate Judge shall provide a report and recommendation, and trial. (zad)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE for full case management, excluding resolution of dispositive motions, for which the Magistrate Judge shall provide a report and recommendation, and trial. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/9/2019. (lctjk3)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued as to ANDREW M. SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (adh, )
December 6, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zmd)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIAT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. "Leave to file without prepayment of costs GRANTED" signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/26/2019. (zmd)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by YOLANDA FLEMING (adh, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL filed by YOLANDA FLEMING.(adh, )
November 12, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 11/12/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FLEMING v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YOLANDA FLEMING
Represented By: Stephen F. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?