MARSHALL v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORP.
Plaintiff: DENISE MARSHALL
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORP.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03432
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Consent Motion for Leave to File Answer Nunc Pro Tunc. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 1/6/2020. (jag)
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Answer Nunc Pro Tunc by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORP. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A.)(McGrath, Felicity)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORP. served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019 (Wietzke, Marc)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/3/2019. (jag) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/20/2019) (zgdf).
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORP.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
November 18, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zmc)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 ERRATA by DENISE MARSHALL #1 Complaint filed by DENISE MARSHALL. (Wietzke, Marc)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 ERRATA by DENISE MARSHALL #1 Complaint filed by DENISE MARSHALL. (Wietzke, Marc)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORP. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6562699) filed by DENISE MARSHALL. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wietzke, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARSHALL v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENISE MARSHALL
Represented By: Marc T. Wietzke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORP.
Represented By: Felicity Ann McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?