JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
Plaintiff: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
Case Number: 1:2019cv03433
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on January 21, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file, on or before January 13, 2020, a joint status report addressing (1) any documents still to be produced pursuant to FOIA; (2) an anticipated schedule for processing and producing any such documents, and (3) any substantive areas of disagreement between the parties. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/26/19. (lcrdm1)
December 26, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE.(Schaefer, Daniel)
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE (Schaefer, Daniel)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/25/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/25/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/25/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE served on 11/25/2019 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/15/19. (lcrdm1)
November 15, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zmc)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6562761) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, #3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #4 Summons U.S. Department of Commerce)(Orfanedes, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Represented By: Paul J. Orfanedes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?