AMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU et al
Plaintiff: AMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Defendant: OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE and U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
Case Number: 1:2019cv03435
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Complaint due by 1/22/2020. (hmc)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' #6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint on or before January 22, 2020. Counsel are reminded that the Court's #3 Standing Order requires all requests for extension to be filed at least four business days prior to the affected deadline. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/16/2019. (lctnm2)
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES, CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Truong, John)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/18/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/18/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/25/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES served on 11/20/2019; CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU served on 11/22/2019; DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE served on 11/25/2019; OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 11/29/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES served on 11/22/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 11/25/2019 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Mariuxi A. Pintado)(Monahan, Christine)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES, CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/15/2019. (lctnm2)
November 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zrdj)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Monahan, Christine)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES, CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6563278) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to U.S. Att'y for D.C., #3 Summons to U.S. Att'y Gen., #4 Summons to CFPB, #5 Summons to OMB, #6 Summons to HHS, #7 Summons to CMS, #8 Summons to State, #9 Summons to USDA)(Monahan, Christine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Represented By: Christine H. Monahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Represented By: John Cuong Truong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Represented By: John Cuong Truong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
Represented By: John Cuong Truong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES
Represented By: John Cuong Truong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
Represented By: John Cuong Truong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: John Cuong Truong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?