SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
Plaintiff: Al Otro Lado, Inc., SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER and AL OTRO LADO, INC
Defendant: U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION and U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Case Number: 1:2019cv03438
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiff's #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Adam Wiley, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Adam Wiley 9720 Wilshire Blvd, PH Beverly Hills, CA 90212 is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on January 9, 2020. (lccjn3)
January 3, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Adam Wiley, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6698121. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AL OTRO LADO, INC, SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Adam Wiley ISO Motion PHV, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bergin, John)
December 23, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Answer to Complaint due by 1/17/2020. (zcdw)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Defendant's #12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and that Defendant shall file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before January 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 23, 2019. (lccjn3)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiff's #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Claire R. Newman, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Claire R. Newman, 1420 Fifth Avenue Suite 3700 Seattle, WA 98101 is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 23, 2019. (lccjn3)
December 19, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdivia, Diana)
December 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Viggiano Valdivia on behalf of All Defendants (Valdivia, Diana)
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Michaelson on behalf of AL OTRO LADO, INC, SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER (Michaelson, Jon)
December 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Claire Ross Newman, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6649517. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AL OTRO LADO, INC, SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Claire Ross Newman ISO Motion PHV, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bergin, John)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiff's #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Sara J. Bradford, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Sara J. Bradford, 1400 Wewatta Street Suite 600 Denver, CO 80202 is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 11, 201 9. (lccjn3)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiff's #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mansi H. Shah, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Mansi H. Shah, 1080 Marsh Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 11, 2019. (lccjn3)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Jon Michaelson, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Jon Michaelson, 1080 Marsh Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 11, 2019. (lccjn3)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/26/19. (Bergin, John)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/26/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/26/2019. (Bergin, John)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sara J. Bradford, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6573052. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AL OTRO LADO, INC, SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Sara J. Bradford ISO Motion PHV, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bergin, John)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Mansi H. Shah, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6569542. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AL OTRO LADO, INC, SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Mansi H. Shah ISO Motion PHV, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bergin, John)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jon Michaelson, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6569370. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AL OTRO LADO, INC, SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration ISO Motion PHV, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bergin, John)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
November 15, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zmc)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by Al Otro Lado, Inc., SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER (Bergin, John)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6563859) filed by SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER, Al Otro Lado, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - FINAL FOIA Request from AOL, SPLC to CBP - May 31, 2019, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Acknowledgement Letter, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - FOIA Fee Waiver Disposition Reached for CBP-2019-056793, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Narrow the Scope Letter, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 - Response to Narrow the Scope letter re FOIA request CBP-2019-056793 part 7 - June 25 2019, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Summons for US CBP, #8 Summons Summons for US DHS, #9 Summons Summons for US Attorney DC, #10 Summons Summons for US Attorney General)(Bergin, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Represented By: Diana Viggiano Valdivia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Diana Viggiano Valdivia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al Otro Lado, Inc.
Represented By: John Timothy Bergin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER
Represented By: John Timothy Bergin
Represented By: Jon Michaelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AL OTRO LADO, INC
Represented By: John Timothy Bergin
Represented By: Jon Michaelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?