BATTLE v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner: BERNARD BATTLE
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv03441
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 13 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Sent to BERNARD BATTLE; Type of Document Returned: ORDER (adh, )
December 27, 2019 Filing 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Sent to BERNARD BATTLE; Type of Document Returned: ORDER (adh, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address by BERNARD BATTLE (zsb)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED that within thirty (30) days from the filing date of this order, petitioner shall either submit the $5 statutory filing fee, or in the alternative, submit a sworn application to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") pursuant to U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). The court has attached a template IFP application form to this order for convenience. Because petitioner has filed a habeas matter, he need not submit a trust fund account statement. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of the case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/26/19. (zmd)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-07206. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OFCOLUMBIA by Judge Dolly M. Gee. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of this Court transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. (See Order for further details) Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (vm) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2019.]
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: COPY OF DOCKET by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Petitioners request for a copy of the docket in this habeas action is granted. (Docket # 7.) The Clerk will mail a copy to him promptly. The clerk mailed a copy of the docket to Petitioner. (See Minute Order for further details) re: REQUEST to for copy of docket sheet #7 . (vm) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2019.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST to for copy of docket sheet filed by petitioner Bernard Battle. (vm) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2019.]
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 NON-OPPOSITION regarding Transfer filed by Petitioner Bernard Battle. re Order to Show Cause #3 (vm) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2019.]
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from petitioner Bernard Battle. (vm) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause filed by Petitioner Bernard Battle. #3 (vm) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: TRANSFER by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Petitioners response to this order (not to exceed five pages) will be due by September 23. (See Minute Order for further details) (vm) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV111 Notice Re Discrepancies in Filing of Habeas Corpus Petition, #2 IFP Form) (car) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254). Case assigned to Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R Wilner.(Filing fee $ 5 FEE DUE), filed by Petitioner Bernard Battle. (car) Modified on 8/26/2019 (jtil). [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BATTLE v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BERNARD BATTLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?