BOESEN et al v. BROWN et al
Plaintiff: CHRISTIAN BOESEN and AGNIESZKA BOESEN
Defendant: EDWIN L KEATING, III, LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA, LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS and RONALD S. BROWN
Case Number: 1:2019cv03499
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Initial Disclosure due by 1/27/2020. Motion For Joinder Of Additional Parties due by 2/27/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 2/27/2020. Plaintiff Expert Designations due by 6/15/2020. Defendant's Expert Designations due by 8/17/2020. Rebuttal Designations due by 9/14/2020. Discovery due by 12/27/2020. Joint Status Report due by 1/29/2020. (mac)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of #20 Joint Meet and Confer Statement, initial disclosures shall be made on January 27, 2020; motions for joinder of additional parties shall be made on February 27, 2020; amended pleadings shall be filed on February 27, 2020; plaintiff's expert designations shall be made on June 15, 2020; defendant's expert designations shall be made on August 17, 2020; rebuttal designations shall be made on September 14, 2020; and discovery shall close on December 27, 2020. The parties shall file a joint status report with recommendations for further proceedings by no later than January 29, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 01/15/2020. (lcegs2)
December 31, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Oliver H Thomas on behalf of LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA, LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS (Thomas, Oliver) (Main Document 22 replaced on 12/31/2019) (zjf).
December 31, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L Caradonna on behalf of LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA, LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS (Caradonna, Thomas) (Main Document 21 replaced on 12/31/2019) (zjf).
December 27, 2019 Filing 20 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Nace, Matthew)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Thomas L. Caradonna is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/12/2019. (lcegs2)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Oliver H. Thomas is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/12/2019. (lcegs2)
December 6, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Thomas L. Caradonna, Esq., Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6627242. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA, LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Levie, David)
December 6, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Oliver H. Thomas, Esq., Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6627231. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA, LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Levie, David)
December 5, 2019 Filing 17 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by RONALD S. BROWN. (Keating, Edwin)
December 4, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #14 Notice of Appearance was entered in error. Counsel is in provisional status and must renew. Counsel may contact the Attorney Admissions for further instructions. (jf)
November 27, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by RONALD S. BROWN.(Keating, Edwin)
November 27, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Andrew Nace on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Nace, Matthew) (Main Document 15 replaced on 12/3/2019) (zjf).
November 27, 2019 Filing 14 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Barry J. Nace on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Nace, Barry) (Main Document 14 replaced on 12/3/2019) (jf). Modified on 12/4/2019 (jf).
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/27/19. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac)
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA, LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS.(Parker, Bruce)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Levie on behalf of LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA, LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS (Levie, David)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA (Parker, Bruce)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS (Parker, Bruce)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce R Parker on behalf of LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA, LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS (Parker, Bruce)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zmc)
November 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zrdj)
November 22, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #4 Notice of Appearance, #6 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests, #5 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests, #3 Notice of Appearance was entered in error and counsel Is instructed to refile said pleading using his/her own login/password. (zrdj)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 ENTERED IN ERROR.....LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by EDWIN L KEATING, III (Keating, Edwin) Modified on 11/22/2019 (zrdj).
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 ENTERED IN ERROR.....LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by EDWIN L KEATING, III (Keating, Edwin) Modified on 11/22/2019 (zrdj).
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Edwin L. Keating, III on behalf of EDWIN L KEATING, III (Keating, Edwin) Modified on 11/22/2019 (zrdj).
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Edwin L. Keating, III on behalf of All Defendants (Keating, Edwin) Modified on 11/22/2019 (zrdj).
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Edwin L. Keating, III on behalf of All Defendants (Keating, Edwin)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2019 CA 006756 M Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADCDC-6580325 filed by EDWIN L KEATING, III. (Attachments: #1 Superior Court Documents Exhibit 1, #2 Superior Court Documents Exhibit 2, #3 Superior Court Documents Exhibit 3, #4 Superior Court Documents Exhibit 4, #5 Superior Court Documents Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Keating, Edwin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOESEN et al v. BROWN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWIN L KEATING, III
Represented By: Edwin L. Keating, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA
Represented By: Bruce R Parker
Represented By: David A. Levie
Represented By: Oliver H Thomas
Represented By: Thomas L Caradonna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS
Represented By: Bruce R Parker
Represented By: David A. Levie
Represented By: Oliver H Thomas
Represented By: Thomas L Caradonna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD S. BROWN
Represented By: Edwin L. Keating, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTIAN BOESEN
Represented By: Matthew Andrew Nace
Represented By: Barry J. Nace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AGNIESZKA BOESEN
Represented By: Matthew Andrew Nace
Represented By: Barry J. Nace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?