SHARP CHULA VISTA MEDICAL CENTER et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: SHARP MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SHARP CORONADO HOSPITAL AND HEALTHCARE CENTER, GROSSMONT HOSPITAL CORPORATION and SHARP CHULA VISTA MEDICAL CENTER
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv03505
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Referring Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Case directly reassigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson pursuant to the Minute Order dated 12/20/19. Judge Trevor N. McFadden is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
December 20, 2019 Cases Consolidated. Cases 19cv3505 has been consolidated with case 19mc190, pursuant to an Order entered 12/20/2019. From this date forward, all pleadings shall be filed ONLY in 19mc190. (jf)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the December 18, 2019 notice filed by defendant and pursuant to the order docketed on November 4, 2019, the Clerk of Court is directed to transfer to this Court Sharp Chula Vista Med. Ctr. v. Azar, 19-cv-03505-TNM, with the consent of the judge currently assigned. The Clerk of Court is further directed to consolidate the case into In re Allina II-Type DSH Adjustment Cases, 19-mc-190. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/20/19. (DMK)
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ALEX M. AZAR, II. Case related to Case No. 19-mc-00190. (Bryce, Peter)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Bryce on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (Bryce, Peter)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/22/2019. (lctnm2)
November 22, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmc)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GROSSMONT HOSPITAL CORPORATION, SHARP CHULA VISTA MEDICAL CENTER, SHARP CORONADO HOSPITAL AND HEALTHCARE CENTER, SHARP MEMORIAL HOSPITAL (Carroll, Kelly)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6582857) filed by SHARP MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SHARP CHULA VISTA MEDICAL CENTER, GROSSMONT HOSPITAL CORPORATION, SHARP CORONADO HOSPITAL AND HEALTHCARE CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EJR Decision, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons to Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services, #4 Summons to Hon. William P. Barr, Attorney General of the United States, #5 Summons to Hon. Jessie K. Liu, United States Attorney for the District of Columbia, #6 Summons to Robert P. Charrow, General Counsel, United States Department of Health and Human Services)(Carroll, Kelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHARP CHULA VISTA MEDICAL CENTER et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARP MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARP CORONADO HOSPITAL AND HEALTHCARE CENTER
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GROSSMONT HOSPITAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARP CHULA VISTA MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kelly A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Peter M. Bryce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?