A.U. et al v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
Plaintiff: PAMELA UQDAH, TAALIB-DIN ABDUL UQDAH, A. U. and A.U.
Defendant: HANSUEL KANG, HON MURIEL BOWSER, LEWIS FEREBEE, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA and MURIEL BOWSER
Case Number: 1:2019cv03512
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: G Michael Harvey
Referring Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey for full case management up to and excluding trial. (zad)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: It is hereby ORDERED, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 72.2, that this action is referred to a magistrate judge, to be randomly assigned by the Clerk's Office, for full case management up to and excluding trial. This includes, with respect to any potentially dispositive motion, the preparation of a report and recommendation pursuant to Local Civil Rule 72.3. It is further ORDERED that any future filings related to this matter shall have the initials of the presiding district judge and the assigned magistrate judge following the case number in the caption. The parties are reminded that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 73.1, this action may be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for all purposes, including trial, upon the filing of an executed notice of consent by all parties; consent of the presiding district judge is not necessary. The parties are hereby advised, however, that they may decline to consent to such a referral without adverse substantive consequences. Local Civil Rule 73.1(b). Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/2/2020. (lctjk3)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, Defendants' #3 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's complaint by January 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/2/2020. (lctjk3)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file response to Plaintiffs' complaint by MURIEL BOWSER, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Porter, Veronica)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to MURIEL BOWSER, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, LEWIS FEREBEE, HANSUEL KANG. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
November 22, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zmc)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6584061) filed by A. U., TAALIB-DIN ABDUL UQDAH, PAMELA UQDAH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons District of Columbis, #3 Summons Ferebee, #4 Summons Kang, #5 Summons Bowser)(Gruber, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.U. et al v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMELA UQDAH
Represented By: Brian Keith Gruber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAALIB-DIN ABDUL UQDAH
Represented By: Brian Keith Gruber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. U.
Represented By: Brian Keith Gruber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.U.
Represented By: Brian Keith Gruber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HANSUEL KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HON MURIEL BOWSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEWIS FEREBEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Veronica A. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MURIEL BOWSER
Represented By: Veronica A. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?