HOLDER v. BARR et al
Plaintiff: Norris G. Holder, Jr.
Defendant: UTTAM DHILLON, KATHLEEN HAWK SAWYER, JOHN DOE, T.J. WATSON, JOSEPH MCCLAIN, NICOLE ENGLISH, JEFFREY E. KRUEGER, WILLIAM P. BARR, WILLIAM E. WILSON, M.D. and JOHN DOES I-X
Case Number: 1:2019cv03520
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Civil Rights (Other)
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Cases Consolidated. All filings shall be made solely in the Master Case. 19-MC-145 TSC. Compliance with this directive requires that you select "No" when asked "Do you want to spread this docket entry?" (ztd)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Consolidating this action with master case: IN THE MATTER OF THE FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS' EXECUTION PROTOCOL CASES (19-mc-145-TSC. All filings shall be made solely in the Master Case. Compliance with this directive requires that you select "No" when asked "Do you want to spread this docket entry?" All counsel of record shall familiarize themselves with the directives found in the court's August 20, 2019 Order, a copy of which is hereby attached. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/4/19. (Attachments: #1 August 20, 2019 Order Establishing Master Case) (DJS) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/10/2019) (ztb).
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to WILLIAM P. BARR, UTTAM DHILLON, NICOLE ENGLISH, JEFFREY E. KRUEGER, JOSEPH MCCLAIN, KATHLEEN HAWK SAWYER, T.J. WATSON, WILLIAM E. WILSON, M.D.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
December 2, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmc)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET Amended by NORRIS G. HOLDER, JR re #1 Complaint, filed by NORRIS G. HOLDER, JR. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by NORRIS G. HOLDER, JR..(Braden, Scott)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by Norris G. Holder, Jr. Case related to Case No. 1:19-mc-00145-TSC. (Braden, Scott)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of against Norris G. Holder, Jr ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BDCDC-6586031) filed by Norris G. Holder, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons)(Braden, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOLDER v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTTAM DHILLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHLEEN HAWK SAWYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.J. WATSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH MCCLAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICOLE ENGLISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY E. KRUEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM P. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM E. WILSON, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norris G. Holder, Jr.
Represented By: Scott Wilson Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?