PURKEY v. BARR et al
Plaintiff: WESLEY IRA PURKEY
Defendant: WILLIAM P. BARR, JOHN DOE 1 TO X and KATHLEEN HAWK SAWYER
Case Number: 1:2019cv03570
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Civil Rights (Other)
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Minute Order on Motion for Leave to File filed by WILLIAM P. BARR, JOHN DOE 1 TO X, KATHLEEN HAWK SAWYER. (ztd)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #15 Joint Consent Motion for Leave to File Additional Briefing. Purkey may file a response not to exceed five pages by January 28, 2020 at 5PM. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/22/2020. (lcdl)
January 21, 2020 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Additional Briefing by WILLIAM P. BARR, JOHN DOE 1 TO X, KATHLEEN HAWK SAWYER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Response to Purkey's Brief Filed Pursuant to this Court's Order of Dec. 31, 2019)(Hurst, John)
January 14, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order on Motion to Withdraw,, filed by WESLEY IRA PURKEY. (McAleer, Charles)
January 2, 2020 Set/Reset Deadline: Plaintiff shall filed a Response, of no more than 20 pages by 5:00 PM on 1/14/2020, to Defendants' arguments raised in its #11 Opposition that jurisdiction for this claim lies elsewhere. (jth)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's #11 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw is hereby GRANTED. It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiff's #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is hereby terminated and withdrawn without prejudice to renew. Nevertheless, it is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants' arguments raised in its #11 Opposition that jurisdiction for this claim lies elsewhere. The response shall be in writing of no more than 20 pages and shall be filed no later than January 14, 2020 at 5PM. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/31/2019. (lcdl)
December 27, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/26/19. (ztd)
December 26, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KATHLEEN HAWK SAWYER served on 12/26/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/26/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/24/2020.) (eg)
December 17, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Barring Execution of Wesley Purkey Pending Final Disposition on the Merits by WESLEY IRA PURKEY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McAleer, Charles)
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 Memorandum in opposition to re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Barring Execution of Wesley Purkey Pending Final Disposition on the Merits filed by WILLIAM P. BARR, JOHN DOE 1 TO X, KATHLEEN HAWK SAWYER. (Hurst, John)
December 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John Benton Hurst on behalf of All Defendants (Hurst, John)
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (3) Issued as to WILLIAM P. BARR, KATHLEEN HAWK SAWYER, and U.S. Attorney (adh, )
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 12/31/19.....MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Barring Execution of Wesley Purkey Pending Final Disposition on the Merits by WESLEY IRA PURKEY (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Rebecca E. Woodman, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Text of Proposed Order)(McAleer, Charles).
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Rebecca E.Woodman is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiff. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/4/19. (DJS)
December 3, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FIAT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. "Leave to file without prepayment of costs GRANTED." Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/02/2019. (zsb)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Fleming on behalf of WESLEY IRA PURKEY (Fleming, Brian)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Rebecca E. Woodman, Firm: Attorney at Law, L.C., Address: 1263 W. 72nd Ter., Kansas City, Misouri 64114, Phone No.: (785) 979-3672 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6597859. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WESLEY IRA PURKEY (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McAleer, Charles)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by WESLEY IRA PURKEY. Case related to Case No. 19-mc-00145, 19-cv-03214. (McAleer, Charles)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by WESLEY IRA PURKEY (McAleer, Charles)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WESLEY IRA PURKEY , Defendants: William P. Barr, Kathleen Hawk Sawyer, and John Does 1-X (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by WESLEY IRA PURKEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-12 (Part 1 of 2), #2 Exhibit 1-12 (Part 2 of 2), #3 Exhibit 13 (Part 1 of 8), #4 Exhibit 13 (Part 2 of 8), #5 Exhibit 13 (Part 3 of 8), #6 Exhibit 13 (Part 4 of 8), #7 Exhibit 13 (Part 5 of 8), #8 Exhibit 13 (Part 6 of 8), #9 Exhibit 13 (Part 7 of 8), #10 Exhibit 13 (Part 8 of 8), #11 Exhibit 14 (Part 1 of 7), #12 Exhibit 14 (Part 2 of 7), #13 Exhibit 14 (Part 3 of 7), #14 Exhibit 14 (Part 4 of 7), #15 Exhibit 14 (Part 5 of 7), #16 Exhibit 14 (Part 6 of 7), #17 Exhibit 14 (Part 7 of 7), #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Exhibit 28, #32 Exhibit 29, #33 Exhibit 30, #34 Exhibit 31, #35 Exhibit 32, #36 Exhibit 33, #37 Exhibit 34, #38 Exhibit 35, #39 Exhibit 36, #40 Exhibit 37, #41 Exhibit 38, #42 Exhibit 39, #43 Exhibit 40, #44 Exhibit 41, #45 Exhibit 42, #46 Exhibit 43, #47 Exhibit 44, #48 Exhibit 45, #49 Civil Cover Sheet, #50 Summons W. Barr, #51 Summons J. Liu, #52 Summons K. Sawyer)(McAleer, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PURKEY v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESLEY IRA PURKEY
Represented By: Charles FrancisBenedict McAleer, Jr.
Represented By: Brian J. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM P. BARR
Represented By: John Benton Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1 TO X
Represented By: John Benton Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHLEEN HAWK SAWYER
Represented By: John Benton Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?