PETERSON v. FOSTER GARVEY P.C.
Plaintiff: CARY LEE PETERSON
Defendant: ASHLEY BALCERZAK, KASELEHLIE PRESS, WILLIAM JAYNES, CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY ["CPI"], a non-governmental (news) organization based in Washington, D.C., JOHN DOE, JEFF WEAVER, DEBORAH OREMLAND, STEVEN V. FINNEN, MARK R. FRAYNE, FEDERAL DEFENDER OFFICE OF NEW JERSEY, FISCALNOTE, INC., MATTHEW REILLY, MARK FRAYNE AND ASSOCIATES, MICHAEL BECKEL, ARNOLD PORTER KAYE SCHOLER LLP, ADAM KLEIN, BAS BROADCASTING OHIO, FOSTER GARVEY P.C., BRIAN REILLY, HUFFPOST, MICHAEL SHAW, MURPHY PANUELO, MARTIN WILLIAMS, EASTMAN AND SMITH LTD., STUART GOLDBERG, STEPHEN SAVAGE, FINANCIAL INSTITUTION REGULATORY AUTHORITY, SETON HALL UNIVERSITY, ROBERT W. COOK, THOMAS KLEIN, LATESHIA BEAHUM, NICK CARTER, GUARDIAN NEWS AND MEDIA LIMITED, JOSEPH E. NYRE, BERNIE 2016, INC., BRAD C. DEUTSCH, CRAIG REFFNER, K. ANTHONY THOMAS and CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY
Case Number: 1:2019cv03662
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Civil Rights (Other)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Filing 15 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Sent to CARY LEE PETERSON; Type of Document Returned: ORDER;.. (adh, )
April 13, 2020 Filing 14 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re #12 Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis, ;USCA Case Number 20-5058. (adh, )
April 13, 2020 Filing 13 ENTERED IN ERROR.....ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to #9 Notice of Appeal filed by CARY LEE PETERSON ; USCA Case Number 20-5058. (adh, )
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. The Clerk for the District Court for the District of Columbia will immediately notify the United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia regarding the disposition. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/13/2020. (dm)
March 17, 2020 USCA Case Number 20-5058 for #9 Notice of Appeal filed by CARY LEE PETERSON. (zsb)
March 16, 2020 Filing 11 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. Motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis has been filed. Another transmission will be forwarded when the motion has been decided re #9 Notice of Appeal. (zsb)
February 25, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by CARY LEE PETERSON (zsb)
February 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #4 Pro Se Order Directing Prisoner Statement, by CARY LEE PETERSON. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(zsb)
February 25, 2020 Filing 8 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by CARY LEE PETERSON (zsb)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of this Order, the plaintiff shall provide a certified copy of his trust fund account statement for the six-month period preceding the filing of his complaint, denying 6 Motion to Amend/Correct and that, within 30 days of this Order, the plaintiff shall file his amended complaint. The amended complaint shall name all parties, provide an address for each party, and include all the claims the plaintiff intends to bring, in a single document. In addition, the amended complaint must comply with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8, 9, 10, and 11, and Local Civil Rule 5.1. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/27/2020. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. (zrdj)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint (See docket entry #5 to view document) by CARY LEE PETERSON (zsb)
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #4 Pro Se Order Directing Prisoner Statement, filed by CARY LEE PETERSON. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(zsb)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/17/2019. (adh, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Convene Three-Judge Court by CARY LEE PETERSON. (zmd)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CARY LEE PETERSON. (zmd)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ARNOLD PORTER KAYE SCHOLER LLP, ASHLEY BALCERZAK, BAS BROADCASTING OHIO, LATESHIA BEAHUM, MICHAEL BECKEL, BERNIE 2016, INC., NICK CARTER, CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY ["CPI"], a non-governmental (news) organization based in Washington, D.C., ROBERT W. COOK, BRAD C. DEUTSCH, JOHN DOE, EASTMAN AND SMITH LTD., FEDERAL DEFENDER OFFICE OF NEW JERSEY, FINANCIAL INSTITUTION REGULATORY AUTHORITY, STEVEN V. FINNEN, FISCALNOTE, INC., FOSTER GARVEY P.C., MARK R. FRAYNE, STUART GOLDBERG, GUARDIAN NEWS AND MEDIA LIMITED, HUFFPOST, WILLIAM JAYNES, KASELEHLIE PRESS, ADAM KLEIN, THOMAS KLEIN, MARK FRAYNE AND ASSOCIATES, JOSEPH E. NYRE, DEBORAH OREMLAND, MURPHY PANUELO, CRAIG REFFNER, BRIAN REILLY, MATTHEW REILLY, STEPHEN SAVAGE, SETON HALL UNIVERSITY, MICHAEL SHAW, K. ANTHONY THOMAS, JEFF WEAVER, MARTIN WILLIAMS with Jury Demand filed by CARY LEE PETERSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (zmd)
December 2, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 12/2/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PETERSON v. FOSTER GARVEY P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHLEY BALCERZAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KASELEHLIE PRESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM JAYNES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY ["CPI"], a non-governmental (news) organization based in Washington, D.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFF WEAVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBORAH OREMLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN V. FINNEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK R. FRAYNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL DEFENDER OFFICE OF NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FISCALNOTE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW REILLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK FRAYNE AND ASSOCIATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL BECKEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARNOLD PORTER KAYE SCHOLER LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAM KLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAS BROADCASTING OHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER GARVEY P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN REILLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUFFPOST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL SHAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MURPHY PANUELO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTIN WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EASTMAN AND SMITH LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STUART GOLDBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN SAVAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FINANCIAL INSTITUTION REGULATORY AUTHORITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SETON HALL UNIVERSITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT W. COOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS KLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LATESHIA BEAHUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICK CARTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUARDIAN NEWS AND MEDIA LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH E. NYRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERNIE 2016, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRAD C. DEUTSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRAIG REFFNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. ANTHONY THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARY LEE PETERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?