TOMELLERI v. NATIONAL GEOGRAPHIC SOCIETY
Plaintiff: JOSEPH R TOMELLERI and JOSEPH R. TOMELLERI
Defendant: NATIONAL GEOGRAPHIC SOCIETY
Case Number: 1:2019cv03720
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave of Lauren C. Chamblee to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. The Court notes that the applicant is a senior associate in an office located in the District of Columbia, so she is strongly encouraged to apply for admission to the bar of this Court. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/10/20. (DMK)
February 10, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lauren C. Chamblee, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6813488. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATIONAL GEOGRAPHIC SOCIETY (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren C. Chamblee)(Shaw, Anna)
February 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan C. Quinn on behalf of NATIONAL GEOGRAPHIC SOCIETY (Quinn, Brendan)
February 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Kurian Shaw on behalf of NATIONAL GEOGRAPHIC SOCIETY (Shaw, Anna)
February 5, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David Martin Foster on behalf of NATIONAL GEOGRAPHIC SOCIETY (Foster, David)
February 4, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE by JOSEPH R. TOMELLERI. NATIONAL GEOGRAPHIC SOCIETY waiver sent on 1/27/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. (Stichel, H.)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave of Oliver P. Maguire to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer.Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/9/20. (DMK)
January 8, 2020 Filing 6 Second MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Oliver Maguire, Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by JOSEPH R. TOMELLERI (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Oliver Maguire)(Stichel, H.)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for failure to comply with the specific requirements of Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), in particular subpart (4) which requires a certification that the attorney either has or has not been disciplined by any bar and the circumstances of any discipline. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/6/20. (DMK)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Oliver Maguire, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6700334. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JOSEPH R. TOMELLERI (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Oliver Maguire, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stichel, H.)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS(1) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL GEOGRAPHIC SOCIETY. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
December 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (adh, )
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 ERRATA (Civil Cover Sheet) by JOSEPH R TOMELLERI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Civil Cover Sheet))(Stichel, H.)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Stichel, H.)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL GEOGRAPHIC SOCIETY with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6644117) filed by JOSEPH R TOMELLERI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Stichel, H.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TOMELLERI v. NATIONAL GEOGRAPHIC SOCIETY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL GEOGRAPHIC SOCIETY
Represented By: David Martin Foster
Represented By: Anna Kurian Shaw
Represented By: Brendan C. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH R TOMELLERI
Represented By: H. Mark Stichel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH R. TOMELLERI
Represented By: H. Mark Stichel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?