FATHOLLAH POUR v. BARR et al
Plaintiff: ALIREZA FATHOLLAH POUR
Defendant: MIKE POMPEO, CHAD WOLF, CARL RISCH, K. SCOTT CECIL, WILLIAM BARR, JOHN DOES #1-#10, ELIZABETH KHUSE and CHAD F. WOLF
Case Number: 1:2019cv03725
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Royce C Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of All Defendants (Cirino, Paul)
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ELIZABETH KHUSE served on 12/30/2019; MIKE POMPEO served on 12/30/2019; CARL RISCH served on 12/30/2019 (Nimer, Jennifer)
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CHAD WOLF served on 12/30/2019 (Nimer, Jennifer)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/30/2019. (Nimer, Jennifer)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/17/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/15/2020. (Nimer, Jennifer)
December 17, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #2 Notice (Other) was entered in error and was filed by counsel as docket entry #3 (adh, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to WILLIAM BARR, ELIZABETH KHUSE, MIKE POMPEO, CARL RISCH, CHAD WOLF, and U.S. Attorney (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
December 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (adh, )
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ERRATA by ALIREZA FATHOLLAH POUR re #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus,, #2 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nimer, Jennifer)
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE OF ERRATA by ALIREZA FATHOLLAH POUR re #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nimer, Jennifer) Modified on 12/17/2019 (adh, ).
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS AND COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6645300) filed by ALIREZA FATHOLLAH POUR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons AUSA, #9 Summons USAG, #10 Summons Secretary of State, #11 Summons Assistant Sec of Consular Affairs, #12 Summons CG US Embassy Yerevan, #13 Summons Acting Secretary DHS)(Nimer, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FATHOLLAH POUR v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE POMPEO
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD WOLF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARL RISCH
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. SCOTT CECIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES #1-#10
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIZABETH KHUSE
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD F. WOLF
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALIREZA FATHOLLAH POUR
Represented By: Jennifer E. Nimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?