SPRINT SOLUTIONS, INC. v. MOBILE NOW, INC. et al
Plaintiff: SPRINT SOLUTIONS, INC.
Defendant: STEVEN QURESHI, ROBERT QURESHI and MOBILE NOW, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03752
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: John D Bates
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 RESPONSE RESPONSE TO OBJECTION by MOBILE NOW, INC., ROBERT QURESHI, STEVEN QURESHI re #38 Response to Order of the Court, Order, (Richeimer, Gabriela) Modified event title on 10/2/2020 (znmw).
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order, Termination of the Present Action filed by SPRINT SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gendron, Grant)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Case subject to termination on 9/24/2020. (tb)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that absent an objection by not later than September 24, 2020, the Court will terminate this case because all issues that were before the Court have been decided. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 09/08/2020. (lcjdb3)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SEALED MOTION filed by SPRINT SOLUTIONS, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ztd)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REDACTED TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION HEARING re #28 before Judge John D. Bates held on January 8, 2020; Page Numbers: 1-58. Origianal Date of Issuance: 2/22/2020. Redactions Submitted: 5/01/2020. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/22/2020. (Wayne, Bryan) Modified event title on 5/5/2020 (znmw). Modified to add link on 7/30/2020 (znmw).
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #35 Sprint Solutions, Inc.'s consent motion for leave to file revised exhibit under seal, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that [35-2] Sprint's Second Motion to Redact Hearing Transcript and [35-3], [35-4] the attached exhibits shall be filed under seal by the Clerk of the Court; it is further ORDERED that [35-2] Sprint's Second Motion to Redact Hearing Transcript is DENIED AS MOOT because it requests relief already granted in this Court's April 13, 2020 Memorandum Opinion and Order; and it is further ORDERED that a redacted version of the transcript of this Court's Jan. 8, 2020 motion hearing, consistent with [35-4] Sprint's proposed redactions, shall be filed on the public docket by the Court Reporter. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/1/2020. (lcjdb3)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by SPRINT SOLUTIONS, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Second Motion to Redact Hearing Transcript, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Gendron, Grant)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Joint STATUS REPORT by SPRINT SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Gendron, Grant)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER: Granting in part and denying in part motion to redact. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 04/10/2020.(tb)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SEALED MOTION filed by SPRINT SOLUTIONS, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ztd)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #31 the parties' sealed motion for leave to file Sprint's consent motion under seal, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion to file under seal is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that [31-2] Sprint's consent motion to redact the hearing transcript and accompanying exhibits shall be filed under seal. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/3/2020. (lcjdb3)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by SPRINT SOLUTIONS, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Motion to File Proposed Redactions, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 FILED UNDER SEAL, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Gendron, Grant)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Requests for Redactions by SPRINT SOLUTIONS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gendron, Grant)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #30 the parties' joint motion for an extension of time to file requests for redactions, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the parties shall file any requests for redactions to the January 8 hearing transcript by not later than March 23, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/16/2020. (lcjdb3)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Joint STATUS REPORT by SPRINT SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gendron, Grant)
February 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION HEARING before Judge John D. Bates held on January 8, 2020; Page Numbers: 1-58. Date of Issuance: 2/22/2020. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/14/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/24/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/22/2020.(Wayne, Bryan)
January 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by MOBILE NOW, INC., ROBERT QURESHI, STEVEN QURESHI (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Roche, Sean)
January 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RESPONSE to Order of January 13, 202 by MOBILE NOW, INC., ROBERT QURESHI, STEVEN QURESHI re #23 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Roche, Sean) Modified text on 1/21/2020 (ztd).
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT (Main document Supplemental Declaration Panther ) by SPRINT SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration Jurgensmeyer)(ztd)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/13/2020. (lcjdb3)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #2 plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction. See text of Order and accompanying memorandum opinion for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/13/2020. (lcjdb3)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Proposed Order by SPRINT SOLUTIONS, INC. re Motion Hearing, (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gendron, Grant)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/8/2020 before Judge John D. Bates re #2 Motion For Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by SPRINT SOLUTIONS, INC.; Motion heard and taken under advisement. Parties shall submit to the court a proposed order. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne) (tb)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying #19 motion for live testimony; granting #19 motion for leave to file supplemental declarations. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/7/2020. (lcjdb3)
January 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE re #19 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declarations and for Live Testimony Or, In the Alternative, Defendants' Request To Cross-Designate Live Witnesses filed by MOBILE NOW, INC., ROBERT QURESHI, STEVEN QURESHI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richeimer, Gabriela)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declarations and for Live Testimony by SPRINT SOLUTIONS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Panther Declaration, #2 Exhibit Supplemental Jurgensmeyer Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Gendron, Grant). Added MOTION on 1/6/2020 (ztd).
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPLY to opposition to motion re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by SPRINT SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Gendron, Grant)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge John D. Bates held on 12-19-19; Page Numbers: 1-9. Date of Issuance:12-30-19. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott Wallace, Telephone number 202-354-3196, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. Afte r 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 1/20/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/30/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/29/2020.(Wallace, Scott)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Memorandum in opposition to re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MOBILE NOW, INC., ROBERT QURESHI, STEVEN QURESHI. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Exhibit 1 Declaration of Nathan McGrath, #2 Declaration Exhibit 2 Declaration of Adam DeBernardis, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Richeimer, Gabriela)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE by SPRINT SOLUTIONS, INC.. STEVEN QURESHI waiver sent on 12/19/2019, answer due 2/17/2020. (Fischman, Noam)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE by SPRINT SOLUTIONS, INC.. ROBERT QURESHI waiver sent on 12/19/2019, answer due 2/17/2020. (Fischman, Noam)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE by SPRINT SOLUTIONS, INC.. MOBILE NOW, INC. waiver sent on 12/19/2019, answer due 2/17/2020. (Fischman, Noam)
December 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TRANSCRIPT OF 12/18/19 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE before Judge John D. Bates held on December 18, 2019; Page Numbers: 1-15. Date of Issuance: 12/21/19. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting Transcript Order Form at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 1/11/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/21/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/20/2020.(Wayne, Bryan)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response due by 12/27/2019. Reply due by 1/3/2020. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 1/8/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 30A before Judge John D. Bates. (tb)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying motion for temporary restraining order as moot and setting briefing schedule for motion for preliminary injunction. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/19/2019. (lcjdb3)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry: Status/Telephone Conference held on 12/19/2019 before Judge John D. Bates: Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Scott Wallace) (tb)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry: Telephone Conference held on 12/18/2019 before Judge John D. Bates: Parties to meet and confer on means of holding funds. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne) (tb)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SPRINT SOLUTIONS, INC. (Fischman, Noam)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriela Richeimer on behalf of All Defendants (Richeimer, Gabriela)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John Richard Gerstein on behalf of All Defendants (Gerstein, John)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MOBILE NOW, INC. (Roche, Sean)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Patrick Roche on behalf of MOBILE NOW, INC., ROBERT QURESHI, STEVEN QURESHI (Roche, Sean)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: A telephone status conference is set for December 19, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/18/2019. (lcjdb3)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to MOBILE NOW, INC., ROBERT QURESHI, STEVEN QURESHI. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zrdj)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by SPRINT SOLUTIONS, INC. Case related to Case No. 19cv918. (zrdj)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Grant R. Gendron on behalf of SPRINT SOLUTIONS, INC. (Gendron, Grant)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by SPRINT SOLUTIONS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Matt Panther, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Fischman, Noam). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 12/17/2019 (zrdj).
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MOBILE NOW, INC., ROBERT QURESHI, STEVEN QURESHI ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6650512) filed by SPRINT SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tab 1-8, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Notice to Counsel/Party Notice of Related Case, #4 Summons Mobile One, #5 Summons Robert Qureshi, #6 Summons Steven Qureshi)(Fischman, Noam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPRINT SOLUTIONS, INC. v. MOBILE NOW, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN QURESHI
Represented By: Sean Patrick Roche
Represented By: John Richard Gerstein
Represented By: Gabriela Richeimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT QURESHI
Represented By: Sean Patrick Roche
Represented By: John Richard Gerstein
Represented By: Gabriela Richeimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOBILE NOW, INC.
Represented By: Sean Patrick Roche
Represented By: John Richard Gerstein
Represented By: Gabriela Richeimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPRINT SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Noam Barak Fischman
Represented By: Grant R. Gendron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?